Global Patent Index - EP 1218070 A4

EP 1218070 A4 2003-06-11 - ELECTRONIC GAMING APPARATUS AND METHOD WITH VARIABLE WINNING OUTCOME

Title (en)

ELECTRONIC GAMING APPARATUS AND METHOD WITH VARIABLE WINNING OUTCOME

Title (de)

ELEKTRONISCHES SPIELGERÄT UND -METHODE MIT VARIABLEM GEWINNAUSGANG

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE PARI ELECTRONIQUE ET PROCEDE A RESULTATS GAGNANTS VARIABLES

Publication

EP 1218070 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00964985 A

Priority

  • US 0025082 W
  • US 15358799 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0119472A1] A gaming terminal (210) is provided which can have different configurations at different times with the configuration differing as to which ones, of a plurality of possible game outcomes, are associated with one or more of the game prizes. In one aspect, a game operator can select which outcome to associate with a preferably progressive prize. In some aspects, associations of outcomes with prizes can be selected by players and/or may occur automatically at periodic, random or predetermined times.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63F 9/00; A63F 9/24; G07F 17/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/32 (2006.01); A63F 3/00 (2006.01); A63F 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/3262 (2013.01); G07F 17/32 (2013.01); A63F 3/0645 (2013.01); A63F 2003/0017 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • No Search
  • See also references of WO 0119472A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0119472 A1 20010322; WO 0119472 A9 20021212; AU 7578700 A 20010417; AU 769979 B2 20040212; CA 2385124 A1 20010322; EP 1218070 A1 20020703; EP 1218070 A4 20030611; ZA 200202837 B 20040428

INPADOC legal status


2008-09-24 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080401

2004-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040331

2003-12-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: IGT

2003-06-11 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030425

2002-07-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020405

2002-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI