EP 1218754 A4 20040922 - TORQUE CURRENT COMPARISON FOR CURRENT REASONABLENESS DIAGNOSTICS IN A PERMANENT MAGNET ELECTRIC MACHINE
Title (en)
TORQUE CURRENT COMPARISON FOR CURRENT REASONABLENESS DIAGNOSTICS IN A PERMANENT MAGNET ELECTRIC MACHINE
Title (de)
Strom-Drehmoment-Vergleich zur Plausibilitäts-untersuchung in einer elektrischenMaschine mit permanet Magneten
Title (fr)
COMPARAISON DE COURANTS DE COUPLE POUR DIAGNOSTICS DE VRAISEMBLANCE DE COURANT DANS UNE MACHINE ELECTRIQUE A AIMANT PERMANENT
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 0025463 W 20000915
- US 15405099 P 19990916
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO0120343A1] A current determination and diagnostics method for determining a torque current (38) and determination of the operational status of an electric machine (10).
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
B62D 5/04 (2006.01); H02P 6/00 (2006.01); H02P 6/12 (2006.01); H02P 6/16 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
B62D 5/046 (2013.01); B62D 5/0487 (2013.01); H02P 6/28 (2016.02); H02P 2209/07 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [Y] US 5361210 A 19941101 - FU JIAN-GUO [JP]
- [Y] EP 0822648 A1 19980204 - TEXAS INSTRUMENTS FRANCE [FR], et al
- [Y] EP 0841574 A2 19980513 - RELIANCE ELECTRIC IND CO [US]
- [Y] US 5459732 A 19951017 - WISE WILLIAM D [US], et al
- [X] BLAABJERG, F.; PEDERSEN, J.K.; JAEGER, U.; THOEGERSEN, P.: "Single current sensor technique in the DC link of three-phase PWM-VS inverters: a review and a novel solution", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS, vol. 33, no. 5, September 1997 (1997-09-01) - October 1997 (1997-10-01), pages 1241 - 1253, XP002289234
- [XY] MOYNIHAN, J.F.; BOLOGNANI, S.; KAVANAGH, R.C.; EGAN, M.G.; MURPHY, J.M.D.: "Single sensor current control of AC servodrives using digital signal processors", POWER ELECTRONICS AND APPLICATIONS, vol. 4, 13 September 1993 (1993-09-13) - 16 September 1993 (1993-09-16), pages 415 - 421, XP002289235
- See references of WO 0120343A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
DE FR GB IT
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 0120343 A1 20010322; EP 1218754 A1 20020703; EP 1218754 A4 20040922; JP 2003509997 A 20030311
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 0025463 W 20000915; EP 00963552 A 20000915; JP 2001523878 A 20000915