Global Patent Index - EP 1219290 A9

EP 1219290 A9 2002-11-20 - Hair cosmetic compositions

Title (en)

Hair cosmetic compositions

Title (de)

Haarkosmetische Zusammensetzung

Title (fr)

Composition cosmetique capillaire

Publication

EP 1219290 A9 (EN)

Application

EP 01130505 A

Priority

  • JP 2000403422 A
  • JP 2000403423 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1219290A2] Provided are a hair cosmetic composition comprising an ether type cationic surfactant represented by the following formula (1): <CHEM> wherein, R<1> represents a linear or branched C6-24 alkyl or alkenyl group, R<2> and R<4> each represents a C1-6 alkyl group or -(AO)nH (A: a C2-4 alkylene group, n: a number of from 1 to 6 with the proviso that n pieces of A may be the same or different and their sequence is optional), R<3> represents a C1-6 alkyl group or -(A'O)mH (A': a C2-4 alkylene group, m: a number of from 1 to 6 with the proviso that m pieces of A may be the same or different and their sequence is optional), and X<-> represents an anion; a hair cleansing composition containing the cationic surfactant(1); and a method of treating hair with these compositions. <??>The hair cosmetic composition of the present invention can impart good flexibility and smoothness to hair not only when it is wetted but also after drying. When used as a hair cleansing composition, it provides excellent quality of foam and feeling upon use and exhibits good low-temperature stability.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 7/50; A61K 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/41 (2006.01); A61K 8/44 (2006.01); A61K 8/46 (2006.01); A61K 8/60 (2006.01); A61K 8/73 (2006.01); A61K 8/891 (2006.01); A61K 8/898 (2006.01); A61Q 5/00 (2006.01); A61Q 5/02 (2006.01); A61Q 5/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/898 (2013.01); A61K 8/416 (2013.01); A61K 8/44 (2013.01); A61K 8/463 (2013.01); A61K 8/60 (2013.01); A61K 8/73 (2013.01); A61K 8/891 (2013.01); A61Q 5/12 (2013.01); A61Q 5/00 (2013.01); A61Q 5/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1219290 A2 20020703; EP 1219290 A3 20031105; EP 1219290 A9 20021120; EP 1219290 B1 20100915; CN 1211062 C 20050720; CN 1362057 A 20020807; DE 60143073 D1 20101028; US 2002159966 A1 20021031; US 6737050 B2 20040518

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180104

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171220

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171113

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171212

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-11-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-11-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-10-13 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60143073

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-08-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100915

2011-02-14 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20110202

2010-10-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60143073 P 20101028

2010-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2010-09-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2010-04-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DOI, YASUHIRO

2010-04-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HASEBE, KEIKO

2010-04-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MASUDA, HIROYUKI

2010-04-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FUKUSHIMA, TETSUAKI

2010-04-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NISHIMOTO, UICHIRO

2010-04-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ABE, HIROSHI

2010-04-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 8/41 20060101AFI20100311BHEP

2010-04-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 8/898 20060101ALI20100311BHEP

2010-04-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 8/891 20060101ALI20100311BHEP

2010-04-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 8/44 20060101ALI20100311BHEP

2010-04-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 8/60 20060101ALI20100311BHEP

2010-04-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 8/73 20060101ALI20100311BHEP

2010-04-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61Q 5/00 20060101ALI20100311BHEP

2010-04-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61Q 5/02 20060101ALI20100311BHEP

2010-04-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61Q 5/12 20060101ALI20100311BHEP

2010-02-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20091014

2004-07-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-06-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040415

2003-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-11-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-07-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI