Global Patent Index - EP 1219518 B1

EP 1219518 B1 2007-10-24 - A park brake system for vehicles

Title (en)

A park brake system for vehicles

Title (de)

Feststellbremsanlage für Kraftfahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Système de freinage de stationnement pour véhicules

Publication

EP 1219518 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 01130537 A

Priority

DE 20022050 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1219518A2] A park brake system for vehicles is provided that has an actuator (10) with an electric drive motor and an electronic control unit provided with an interface. A reduction gear has an input connected to the output of the electric motor and an output member for connection to mechanical brakes of the vehicle. A command unit (22) has a transducer connected to the electronic control unit. The transducer converts position indication signals into appropriate digital signals to enable the control unit to generate corresponding brake control commands. With appropriate control signals from the electronic control unit, the mechanical brake system can thus reflect positional brake commands from the command unit (22) within an operating range from OFF to ON, including partial activation conditions of the park brake. <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60T 8/17 (2006.01); B60T 13/74 (2006.01); B60T 7/02 (2006.01); B60T 7/10 (2006.01); F16D 65/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60T 7/107 (2013.01); B60T 13/746 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1219518 A2 20020703; EP 1219518 A3 20020821; EP 1219518 B1 20071024; DE 60131064 D1 20071206; DE 60131064 T2 20080814; JP 2002255017 A 20020911; US 2002084154 A1 20020704; US 6513632 B2 20030204

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160701

2016-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60131064

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141230

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101221

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101221

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110103

2011-09-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110831

2011-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101221

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091221

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091216

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091218

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-10-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080725

2008-07-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-01-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: TRW AUTOMOTIVE ELECTRONICS & COMPONENTS GMBH

2007-12-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60131064 P 20071206

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-10-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030203

2003-02-06 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

2002-10-11 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

2002-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-08-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-07-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI