Global Patent Index - EP 1219747 B2

EP 1219747 B2 2007-10-10 - Process for cleaning a transport belt

Title (en)

Process for cleaning a transport belt

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Reinigen eines Transportbandes

Title (fr)

Procédé pour nettoyer une bande de transport

Publication

EP 1219747 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 02002843 A

Priority

  • DE 19726897 A
  • EP 98108953 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0887460A1] A new method which cleans a conveyor, e.g. a fabric belt, forming part of a paper- or card making machine. A special feature is that the belt is cleaned with varied intensity over its width. Also claimed are: (i) use of the process to adjust the moisture profile of the belt; and (ii) equipment to clean as described; which includes a nozzle unit (5) designed for non-uniform cleaning over the belt (7) width.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/325 (2013.01); D21F 1/32 (2013.01)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0887460 A1 19981230; EP 0887460 B1 20020814; EP 0887460 B2 20061004; DE 19726897 A1 19990107; DE 19726897 C2 20000113; EP 1219747 A2 20020703; EP 1219747 A3 20020724; EP 1219747 B1 20040204; EP 1219747 B2 20071010; US 5964956 A 19991012

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-03-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59810727

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120517

2013-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120516

2013-01-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110520

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20110512

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110513

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-01-15 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

2007-10-10 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20071010

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2007-06-27 [RTI2] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS FOR CLEANING A TRANSPORT BELT

2006-09-13 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

2004-12-29 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: METSO PAPER, INC.

- Effective date: 20041102

2004-04-20 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-03-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59810727 P 20040311

2004-02-04 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0887460 P

2004-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2003-04-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2003-03-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030124

2002-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2002-07-03 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 887460

2002-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE