Global Patent Index - EP 1219904 A3

EP 1219904 A3 2002-09-25 - Smoke extracting hood

Title (en)

Smoke extracting hood

Title (de)

Dunstabzugshaube

Title (fr)

Hotte aspirante de buée

Publication

EP 1219904 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01128910 A

Priority

DE 20021711 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1219904A2] The steam extractor hood (1) for a kitchen cooker has one or more electrical connectors (5) which can be connected to the extractor hood circuit. The connector is coupled to a lighting circuit (3) of a kitchen cupboard (2). The lighting is connected to the hood connector and the plug connection.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 15/20; B08B 15/02; F21V 23/06; H01R 13/73

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/2064 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20021711 U1 20010215; EP 1219904 A2 20020703; EP 1219904 A3 20020925

INPADOC legal status


2007-07-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070116

2006-08-16 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ARRANGEMENT WITH A SMOKE EXTRACTING HOOD

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030325

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-07-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI