Global Patent Index - EP 1220375 A3

EP 1220375 A3 2003-06-11 - Electrical connector system and plug and socket therefore

Title (en)

Electrical connector system and plug and socket therefore

Title (de)

Elektrisches Steckverbindersystem sowie Stecker und Buchse für Steckverbindersystem

Title (fr)

Système de connecteur électrique et prises mâle et femelle pour système de connecteur électrique

Publication

EP 1220375 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01130159 A

Priority

DE 10065595 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1220375A2] The system consists of a plug (12) and socket (14) of a first type, whereby at least one off these has a contact arm (42) for electrical connection to the other and the contact arm for connecting the socket or plug of the first type to a plug or socket of a second type of different construction is arranged in a first position. The contact arm or arms can be pivoted into a second position by connecting the plug connector system. <??>AN Independent claim is also included for the following: a socket for an inventive system, a plug for an inventive system and a socket for a inventive plug.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/703

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/703 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/7031 (2013.01); H01R 24/64 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1220375 A2 20020703; EP 1220375 A3 20030611; DE 10065595 A1 20020814

INPADOC legal status


2006-10-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051219

2004-10-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVAR GMBH

2004-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040330

2004-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-12-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031009

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-07-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI