Global Patent Index - EP 1220709 B1

EP 1220709 B1 2003-06-04 - ANKLE GUARD

Title (en)

ANKLE GUARD

Title (de)

KNÖCHELSCHÜTZER

Title (fr)

PROTEGE-CHEVILLE

Publication

EP 1220709 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 00979371 A

Priority

  • DE 0003308 W
  • DE 29918035 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0126745A2] The invention relates to an ankle guard (1) comprising a shin guard (2) for sporting purposes. The shin guard (2) consists of a shell (4) which is lined inside and covers the area of the leg (3), whereby said area has to be protected. The shell consists of a compact plastic material. The aim of the invention is to configure the ankle guard in such a way that an improved and optimised protection against impacts in additional areas of the ankle guard (1) is guaranteed. To this end, the ankle guard (1) is provided with at least two or a plurality of areas (5) in areas that are at risk of impacts, whereby said first areas are set off from each other and are each provided with a padding element (6).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63B 71/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41D 31/00 (2006.01); A63B 71/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 71/1225 (2013.01); A41D 31/005 (2013.01); A63B 2071/1258 (2013.01); A63B 2071/1266 (2013.01); A63B 2071/1283 (2013.01); A63B 2209/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29918035 U1 20010301; EP 1220709 A2 20020710; EP 1220709 B1 20030604; WO 0126745 A2 20010419; WO 0126745 A3 20020110

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060401

2005-09-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050921

2005-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-11 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040921

2004-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040930

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-09-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040921

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-04-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-11-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031014

2003-09-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030929

- Year of fee payment: 4

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50002482 P 20030710

2003-07-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011006

2002-07-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE