Global Patent Index - EP 1221410 A3

EP 1221410 A3 2002-09-04 - Method and apparatus for packaging articles

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for packaging articles

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Verpacken von Gegenständen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour emballer des articles

Publication

EP 1221410 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01130784 A

Priority

DE 10100487 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1221410A2] Device for packing objects in bags (10) comprises a rotating slide (3, 4) for the objects, a packing cassette (5) receiving and guiding an object to be packed and moved backward and forward in the conveying direction from a feed position to a transfer position, a bag station arranged in the path of the packing cassette, and a transfer cassette (6) receiving a packed object and arranged so that it moves backward and forward between a receiving position and a sealing position. An Independent claim is also included for a method for packing objects in bags. Preferred Features: The packing cassette is arranged so that in its feed position the slide can slide the object inside.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 5/06; B65B 63/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 5/06 (2006.01); B65B 25/20 (2006.01); B65B 35/36 (2006.01); B65B 35/40 (2006.01); B65B 35/54 (2006.01); B65B 63/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 5/067 (2013.01); B65B 63/02 (2013.01); B65B 63/022 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1221410 A2 20020710; EP 1221410 A3 20020904; EP 1221410 B1 20040428; AT 265358 T 20040515; ES 2220654 T3 20041216; JP 2002249103 A 20020903; JP 4113708 B2 20080709; US 2002124533 A1 20020912; US 6755008 B2 20040629

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180105

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20171219

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171219

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-12-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-05-02 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OPTIMA NONWOVENS GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OPTIMA FILLING AND PACKAGING MACHINES GMBH, 74523 SCHWAEBISCH HALL, DE

- Document: DE 50102117

2016-05-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50102117

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE RUFF, WILHELM, BEIER, DAUSTER &, DE

2015-12-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040928

2006-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-04-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-02-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041222

2004-12-22 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041222

2004-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2220654 T3

2004-12-01 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-10-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-07-28 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040728

2004-07-28 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040728

2004-07-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040614

2004-06-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50102117 P 20040603

2004-06-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-05-04 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-04-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-04-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040428

2004-04-28 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040428

2004-04-28 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040428

2004-04-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040428

2004-04-28 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040428

2004-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHMETZER, DIETMAR

2004-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GRIESSMAYR, KLAUS

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030326

2003-03-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030118

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-07-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-07-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI