Global Patent Index - EP 1221426 A3

EP 1221426 A3 2002-09-11 - Crane safety devices and methods

Title (en)

Crane safety devices and methods

Title (de)

Sicherheitsvorrichtung und Verfahren für Kräne

Title (fr)

Dispositif et méthode de sécurité pour grues

Publication

EP 1221426 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01200047 A

Priority

EP 01200047 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1221426A2] A crane safety device comprising a plurality of wind speed and direction sensors (53) and a control console (48) to display this information and to limit the operation of the crane to safe conditions. Other sensors for boom length (68) etc. are used to evaluate safe conditions. The wind sensor is pivoted and has a counterweight (65) to ensure that the sensor remains vertical at all boom angles. A crane control decision network (66) is also disclosed for programming the setup of the crane. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66C 15/06; B66C 23/90

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66C 15/06 (2006.01); B66C 23/90 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66C 23/905 (2013.01); B66C 15/065 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] NL 8503113 A 19870601 - TECHNO DIAGNOSIS BV
  • [XY] WO 9855388 A1 19981210 - WILLIAM HOOK LIMITED [GB], et al
  • [A] JP S5842600 A 19830312 - NIHON KIKAI KOGYO KK
  • [DA] US 5731974 A 19980324 - PIETZSCH HEINZ WERNER [DE], et al
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 04 30 April 1997 (1997-04-30)
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 06 31 July 1995 (1995-07-31)
  • [Y] DATABASE WPI Section PQ Week 198229, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class Q38, AN 1982-J7255E, XP002182910

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1221426 A2 20020710; EP 1221426 A3 20020911

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050202

2003-11-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-07-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-07-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-07-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-07-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI