Global Patent Index - EP 1221794 A9

EP 1221794 A9 2002-12-04 - Method and arrangement to determine a clock timing error in a multi-carrier transmission system

Title (en)

Method and arrangement to determine a clock timing error in a multi-carrier transmission system

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bestimmung eines Taktfehlers in einem Mehrträgerübertragungssystem

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la détermination des erreurs temporelles d'horloge dans un système à transmission multiporteuse

Publication

EP 1221794 A9 (EN)

Application

EP 01400024 A

Priority

EP 01400024 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1221794A1] The invention relates to a reception arrangement for receiving multicarrier symbols, each multicarrier symbol (S1, S2, S3) comprising a plurality of single carrier symbols, each symbol modulating a respective carrier frequency (f1, f2, f3). The single carrier symbols are transmitted simultaneously. The arrangement comprises means for detecting phase error of each single carrier and means for correcting the phase of a sampling clock (52) in view of the estimated error. The means for estimating phase error comprise means (581 ... 58N, 24, 40) for determining a parameter êi for a carrier fi according to the following formula: <MATH> wherein ri_k is the detected signal for the single carrier at a time t, ai_k is the corresponding symbol at the same time t, ai_k-1 and ri_k-1 correspond, respectively, to ai_k and ri_k at time t-NT, NT being the duration of transmission of a multicarrier symbol, and EÄ Ü means an average value on several successive symbols. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 27/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04J 11/00 (2006.01); H04L 27/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 27/2662 (2013.01); H04L 27/2657 (2013.01); H04L 27/2679 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1221794 A1 20020710; EP 1221794 A9 20021204; JP 2002217859 A 20020802; US 2002150071 A1 20021017

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-21 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031121

2003-06-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030429

2003-04-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-03-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030110

2002-07-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-07-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI