EP 1222062 A4 20021113 - MOULDING MACHINE
Title (en)
MOULDING MACHINE
Title (de)
VORRICHTUNG ZUM GIESSEN
Title (fr)
MACHINE DE MOULAGE
Publication
Application
Priority
- AU 0001099 W 20000914
- AU PQ290499 A 19990916
- AU PQ438599 A 19991202
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO0119585A1] There is provided a mould device comprising: (a) a frame; (b) a pair of first mould parts located on the frame at spaced first and second moulding stations; (c) a pair of mould part carriers located on the frame and moveable relative to each other and the first and second moulding stations; (d) a pair of second mould parts each mounted on one of the mould part carriers; and (e) an actuator located between the mould carriers to move the second mould parts into and out of registry with the first mould parts.
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
B22D 46/00 (2006.01); B22D 17/22 (2006.01); B22D 17/26 (2006.01); B22D 47/00 (2006.01); B29C 33/36 (2006.01); B29C 45/04 (2006.01); B29C 45/06 (2006.01); B29C 45/32 (2006.01); B29C 45/72 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP KR)
B29C 33/36 (2013.01 - KR); B29C 45/0416 (2013.01 - EP); B29C 45/0441 (2013.01 - EP); B29C 45/32 (2013.01 - EP); B29C 45/7207 (2013.01 - EP); B29C 2045/328 (2013.01 - EP)
Citation (search report)
- [XY] DE 1066731 B
- [Y] CH 480936 A 19691115 - VALYI EMERY I DR [US]
- [Y] US 4449913 A 19840522 - KRISHNAKUMAR SUPPAYAN M [US], et al
- [Y] EP 0283644 A2 19880928 - HUSKY INJECTION MOLDING [CA]
- [A] US 3806296 A 19740423 - AOKI K
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 065 (M - 1554) 3 February 1994 (1994-02-03)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 07 31 July 1996 (1996-07-31)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013, no. 217 (M - 828) 22 May 1989 (1989-05-22)
- See references of WO 0119585A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 0119585 A1 20010322; CA 2383062 A1 20010322; CN 1374901 A 20021016; EP 1222062 A1 20020717; EP 1222062 A4 20021113; JP 2003509235 A 20030311; KR 20020033795 A 20020507; TW 472002 B 20020111
DOCDB simple family (application)
AU 0001099 W 20000914; CA 2383062 A 20000914; CN 00813010 A 20000914; EP 00963789 A 20000914; JP 2001523192 A 20000914; KR 20027003298 A 20020313; TW 89118967 A 20000915