Global Patent Index - EP 1222122 B1

EP 1222122 B1 2003-06-25 - COMBINATION PACKAGING

Title (en)

COMBINATION PACKAGING

Title (de)

KOMBINATIONSVERPACKUNG

Title (fr)

EMBALLAGE COMBINE

Publication

EP 1222122 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 00972765 A

Priority

  • DE 19950884 A
  • EP 0010132 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19950884A1] The package for two liquids (2, 3) which are mixed before use consists of a bottle (7) containing the first liquid and a screw cap (6) fitted on to it with a pot (10) inside containing the second liquid. The bottom of the pot is sealed by a sheet of foil (11) and the bottle is sealed by a cup-shaped stopper (13). A pin (22) at the center of this pierces the foil when the cap is screwed more tightly on to the bottle. The stopper has a sloping floor and has a line of weakness (18) in the deepest area (17) which is ruptured at the same time.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 51/28; B65D 81/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 51/28 (2006.01); B65D 81/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 51/285 (2013.01); B65D 51/2835 (2013.01); B65D 51/2857 (2013.01); B65D 81/3211 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19950884 A1 20010426; AU 1138301 A 20010508; EP 1222122 A1 20020717; EP 1222122 B1 20030625; WO 0130665 A1 20010503

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100630

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071014

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081006

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081031

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061014

2007-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061014

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-09-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050926

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-03-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-11-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-10-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50002675 P 20030731

2003-07-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020226

2002-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI