EP 1223130 A3 20040428 - Levelling device for receiving paper with at least two sections of different thickness
Title (en)
Levelling device for receiving paper with at least two sections of different thickness
Title (de)
Nivelliereinrichtung zur Aufnahme von Papier mit mindestens zwei Bereichen unterschiedlicher Dicke
Title (fr)
Dispositif de nivellement pour recevoir du papier avec au moins deux zones d'épaisseurs différentes
Publication
Application
Priority
US 75119300 A 20001228
Abstract (en)
[origin: CA2361656A1] According to an aspect of the invention, a leveling device for paper having at least two different thicknesses for a paper supply tray having a given depth , for a sheet feeder, which comprises a support upon which the paper having at least two different thicknesses rests, wherein the support height is self adjustin g to compensate for the different thicknesses of the paper such that a top sheet of paper is in a position to feed properly into the sheet feeder.
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
B65H 1/08 (2006.01); B65H 1/04 (2006.01); B65H 1/12 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
B65H 1/04 (2013.01 - EP US); B65H 2701/1916 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [X] US 5364087 A 19941115 - SCHIECK RICHARD A [US], et al
- [X] US 5511773 A 19960430 - BURGER MANFRED [AT]
- [X] EP 0361850 A2 19900404 - XEROX CORP [US]
- [X] DE 29903717 U1 19990624 - OCE PRINTING SYSTEMS GMBH [DE]
- [X] US 6142689 A 20001107 - MARGIOTTA AL [US]
- [X] US 4593895 A 19860610 - MYERS KIMBROUGH I [US], et al
- [XA] US 4711443 A 19871208 - FUJIWARA TSUTOMU [JP], et al
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 008, no. 189 (M - 321) 30 August 1984 (1984-08-30)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 09 13 October 2000 (2000-10-13)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 164 (M - 1390) 30 March 1993 (1993-03-30)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1223130 A2 20020717; EP 1223130 A3 20040428; EP 1223130 B1 20060823; CA 2361656 A1 20020628; CA 2361656 C 20051018; DE 10158986 A1 20020711; DE 50110802 D1 20061005; JP 2002226057 A 20020814; JP 3801912 B2 20060726; US 2002084575 A1 20020704; US 6595513 B2 20030722
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 01128339 A 20011130; CA 2361656 A 20011108; DE 10158986 A 20011130; DE 50110802 T 20011130; JP 2001387426 A 20011220; US 75119300 A 20001228