Global Patent Index - EP 1223883 A4

EP 1223883 A4 2007-10-17 - METHOD FOR SAFELY AND EFFICIENTLY NAVIGATING MAGNETIC DEVICES IN THE BODY

Title (en)

METHOD FOR SAFELY AND EFFICIENTLY NAVIGATING MAGNETIC DEVICES IN THE BODY

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR SICHEREN UND EFFEKTIVEN NAVIGATION MAGNETISCHER GERÄTE IM KÖRPER

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE NAVIGATION SUR ET EFFICACE DE DISPOSITIFS MAGNETIQUES DANS LE CORPS

Publication

EP 1223883 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00978896 A

Priority

  • US 0041063 W
  • US 15761999 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0124685A2] A method of turning a medical device (44), having a magnetically responsive element (46) associated with its distal end, at an operating point (42) within an operating region (40) inside a patient's body from an initial direction to a desired final direction, through the movement of at least one external source magnet (38). The at least one external source magnet (38) is moved in such a way as to change the direction of the distal end of the magnetic medical device (44) from the initial direction to the desired final direction without substantial deviation from the plane containing the initial direction and the desired final direction.

[origin: WO0124685A2] A method of turning a medical device, having a magnetically responsive element associated with its distal end, at an operating point within an operating region inside a patient's body from an initial direction to a desired final direction, through the movement of at least one external source magnet. The at least one external source magnet is moved in such a way as to change the direction of the distal end of the magnetic medical device from the initial direction to the desired final direction without substantial deviation from the plane containing the initial direction and the desired final direction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 1/005 (2006.01); A61M 25/01 (2006.01); A61B 1/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61B 1/00158 (2013.01); A61B 1/01 (2013.01); A61B 34/73 (2016.02); A61M 25/0127 (2013.01); A61M 25/0105 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] WO 9923934 A2 19990520 - STEREOTAXIS INC [US]
  • [A] WO 9923946 A1 19990520 - STEREOTAXIS INC [US]
  • [A] GILLIES G T ET AL: "MAGNETIC MANIPULATION INSTRUMENTATION FOR MEDICAL PHYSICS RESEARCH", 1 March 1994, REVIEW OF SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS, AIP, MELVILLE, NY, US, PAGE(S) 533-562, ISSN: 0034-6748, XP000435170
  • [A] MCNEIL R G ET AL: "CHARACTERISTICS OF AN IMPROVED MAGNETIC-IMPLANT GUIDANCE SYSTEM", 1 August 1995, IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, PAGE(S) 802-808, ISSN: 0018-9294, XP000556808
  • See also references of WO 0124685A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0124685 A2 20010412; WO 0124685 A3 20010830; AU 1630601 A 20010510; EP 1223883 A2 20020724; EP 1223883 A4 20071017

INPADOC legal status


2009-02-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080819

2008-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080206

2007-10-17 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20070919

2002-07-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020405

2002-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI