Global Patent Index - EP 1224218 A4

EP 1224218 A4 2003-06-25 - DNA ENCODING HUMAN ALPHA1G-C T-TYPE CALCIUM CHANNEL

Title (en)

DNA ENCODING HUMAN ALPHA1G-C T-TYPE CALCIUM CHANNEL

Title (de)

FüR EINEN HUMANEN CALCIUMKANAL DES TYPS ALPHA1G-C KODIERENDE DNS

Title (fr)

ADN CODANT UN CANAL CALCIUM HUMAIN DE TYPE T ALPHA1G-C

Publication

EP 1224218 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00968858 A

Priority

  • US 0027761 W
  • US 42699899 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0130844A1] A DNA molecule encoding a novel isoform of the human T-type low voltage activated calcium channel (alpha1G-c) has been cloned and characterized. The biological and structural properties of this protein is disclosed, as is the amino acid and nucleotide sequence.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 14/47; A61K 38/17; A61K 38/18; C07K 16/28; C12N 5/10; C12N 15/12; C12N 15/63; C12N 15/64; G01N 33/53; G01N 33/567

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/50 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61P 5/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/02 (2006.01); A61P 9/04 (2006.01); A61P 9/06 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 9/12 (2006.01); A61P 11/00 (2006.01); A61P 13/02 (2006.01); A61P 13/10 (2006.01); A61P 13/12 (2006.01); A61P 15/00 (2006.01); A61P 15/10 (2006.01); A61P 17/02 (2006.01); A61P 21/00 (2006.01); A61P 23/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/08 (2006.01); A61P 25/18 (2006.01); A61P 25/20 (2006.01); A61P 25/24 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 14/705 (2006.01); C07K 16/18 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/02 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/705 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); C12N 2799/026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [E] WO 0070044 A2 20001123 - UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US], et al
  • [E] WO 0119845 A1 20010322 - UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS MED [US]
  • [E] WO 0102561 A2 20010111 - NEUROMED TECH INC [CA], et al
  • [XY] WO 9929847 A1 19990617 - UNIV LOYOLA CHICAGO [US], et al
  • [PX] MITTMAN S ET AL: "STRUCTURE AND ALTERNATIVE SPLICING OF THE GENE ENCODING ALPHA1G, A HUMAN BRAIN T CALCIUM CHANNEL ALPHA1 SUBUNIT", NEUROSCIENCE LETTERS, LIMERICK, IE, vol. 274, no. 3, 1999, pages 143 - 146, XP000946163, ISSN: 0304-3940
  • [PX] MONTEIL A ET AL: "MOLECULAR AND FUNCTIONAL PROPERTIES OF THE HUMAN ALPHA1G SUBUNIT THAT FORMS T-TYPE CALCIUM CHANNELS", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTS, BALTIMORE, MD, US, vol. 275, no. 9, 3 March 2000 (2000-03-03), pages 6090 - 6100, XP000938755, ISSN: 0021-9258
  • [PX] MONTEIL ARNAUD ET AL: "Identification of multiple human alpha1G isoforms of T-type calcium channels with distinct functional properties.", BIOPHYSICAL JOURNAL, vol. 78, no. 1 Part 2, January 2000 (2000-01-01), 44th Annual Meeting of the Biophysical Society.;New Orleans, Louisiana, USA; February 12-16, 2000, pages 199A, XP009009404, ISSN: 0006-3495
  • [PX] CRIBBS L L ET AL: "Molecular cloning and functional expression of Cav3.1c, a T-type calcium channel from human brain", FEBS LETTERS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 466, no. 1, 21 January 2000 (2000-01-21), pages 54 - 58, XP004260835, ISSN: 0014-5793
  • [PX] DUBIN A E ET AL: "Novel isoform of a T-type alpha1G calcium channel isolated from human thalamus.", BIOPHYSICAL JOURNAL, vol. 78, no. 1 Part 2, January 2000 (2000-01-01), 44th Annual Meeting of the Biophysical Society.;New Orleans, Louisiana, USA; February 12-16, 2000, pages 459A, XP009009535, ISSN: 0006-3495
  • [Y] MITTMAN S ET AL: "STRUCTURE AND ALTERNATIVE SPLICING OF THE GENES ENCODING THE HUMAN BRAIN T CA2+ CHANNEL SUBUNITS ALPHA1G AND ALPHA11", SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE ABSTRACTS, SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE, US, vol. 25, no. 1/2, 23 October 1999 (1999-10-23), pages 197, XP000938544, ISSN: 0190-5295
  • [Y] DATABASE EMBL [online] 23 April 1998 (1998-04-23), BIRREN B. ET AL.: "Homo sapiens chromosome 17, clone hCIT.22_K_21, complete sequence", XP002238461, Database accession no. AC004590
  • [X] MONTEIL A ET AL: "Identification of human alpha1G T-type calcium channel splice variants.", SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE ABSTRACTS, vol. 25, no. 1-2, 1999, 29th Annual Meeting of the Society for Neuroscience, Part 1;Miami Beach, Florida, USA; October 23-28, 1999, pages 197, XP009009407, ISSN: 0190-5295
  • [X] JACOBSEN R B ET AL: "Biophysical properties of the alpha1G Ca+2 channel subunit expressed in HEK cells.", SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE ABSTRACTS, vol. 25, no. 1-2, 1999, 29th Annual Meeting of the Society for Neuroscience, Part 1;Miami Beach, Florida, USA; October 23-28, 1999, pages 198, XP009009408, ISSN: 0190-5295
  • [X] PEREZ-REYES E ET AL: "Cloning and expression of a novel gene family encoding low voltage-activated, T-type, calcium channels.", SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE ABSTRACTS, vol. 24, no. 1-2, 1998, 28th Annual Meeting of the Society for Neuroscience, Part 1;Los Angeles, California, USA; November 7-12, 1998, pages 22, XP009009409, ISSN: 0190-5295
  • [X] MONTEIL A ET AL: "Cloning and molecular characterization of alpha1G and alpha1I isoforms of human T-type Ca2+ channels.", BIOPHYSICAL JOURNAL, vol. 76, no. 1 PART 2, January 1999 (1999-01-01), Forty-third Annual Meeting of the Biophysical Society;Baltimore, Maryland, USA; February 13-17, 1999, pages A408, XP009009405, ISSN: 0006-3495
  • [A] DATABASE EMBL [online] 23 June 1995 (1995-06-23), HILLIER ET AL.: "yl77e01.r1 Soares infant brain 1NIB Homo sapiens cDNA clone IMAGE:44039 5' similar to SP:CIC1_CYPCA P22316 DIHYDROPRYRIDINE-SENSITIVE L-TYPE, SKELETAL MUSCLE CALCIUM CHANNEL ALPHA-1; mRNA sequence", XP002238462, Database accession no. H06096
  • See also references of WO 0130844A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0130844 A1 20010503; AU 779987 B2 20050224; AU 7871600 A 20010508; CA 2389031 A1 20010503; EP 1224218 A1 20020724; EP 1224218 A4 20030625; JP 2003529337 A 20031007; TR 200201119 T2 20021121; US 6358706 B1 20020319

INPADOC legal status


2013-05-03 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1048480

2005-12-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050531

2003-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030820

2003-06-25 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030513

2002-07-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020505

2002-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI