Global Patent Index - EP 1224531 B1

EP 1224531 B1 2004-12-15 - METHOD FOR DETECTING THE TIME SEQUENCES OF A FUNDAMENTAL FREQUENCY OF AN AUDIO-RESPONSE UNIT TO BE SYNTHESISED

Title (en)

METHOD FOR DETECTING THE TIME SEQUENCES OF A FUNDAMENTAL FREQUENCY OF AN AUDIO-RESPONSE UNIT TO BE SYNTHESISED

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM BESTIMMEN DES ZEITLICHEN VERLAUFS EINER GRUNDFREQUENZ EINER ZU SYNTHETISIERENDEN SPRACHAUSGABE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR DEFINIR LA COURBE TEMPORELLE D'UNE FREQUENCE DE BASE D'UNE EMISSION VOCALE A SYNTHETISER

Publication

EP 1224531 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 00984858 A

Priority

  • DE 0003753 W
  • DE 19952051 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0131434A2] The invention relates to a method for detecting the time sequences of a fundamental frequency of an audio-response unit to be synthesised. The invention is characterised in that input macro segments of the fundamental frequency are detected by means of a neuronal network and are reproduced by means of fundamental frequency sequences that are stored in a data base. According to the inventive method, the fundamental frequency is produced based on a greater text section which is analysed by means of the neuronal network. Microstructures are transferred from the data base to the fundamental frequency. The thus produced fundamental frequency is optimised in the macro and microstructure thereof. An extremely natural sound is thus obtained.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10L 11/04; G06F 3/16; G10L 13/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 25/90 (2013.01); G10L 25/30 (2013.01); G10L 25/78 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 25/90 (2013.01); G10L 25/30 (2013.01); G10L 2025/783 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0131434 A2 20010503; WO 0131434 A3 20020214; EP 1224531 A2 20020724; EP 1224531 B1 20041215; JP 2003513311 A 20030408; JP 4005360 B2 20071107; US 7219061 B1 20070515

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151102

2016-07-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151024

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151024

2016-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160630

2016-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151024

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-05-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50008976

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141029

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141017

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141013

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131219

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-12-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050916

2005-11-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050211

2005-01-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50008976 P 20050120

2005-01-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-12-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-06-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 10L 11/04 A

2004-06-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 10L 13/08 B

2004-06-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 06F 3/16 B

2004-06-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 10L 11/04 A

2004-06-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 06F 3/16 B

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-07-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020404

2002-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI