Global Patent Index - EP 1224940 A8

EP 1224940 A8 2002-11-20 - Liquid interferon-beta formulations

Title (en)

Liquid interferon-beta formulations

Title (de)

Flüssige Interferon-Beta Formulierungen

Title (fr)

Formulations liquides d' interféron-bèta

Publication

EP 1224940 A8 (DE)

Application

EP 02004883 A

Priority

  • EP 02004883 A
  • EP 98950074 A
  • EP 97116562 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9915193A1] The invention relates to liquid formulations of human interferon- beta . The inventive formulations are characterised in that they have a buffer with a pH value in the slightly acidic to neutral range between 5 and 8, preferably between 5.5 and 8, and in that the interferon- beta is highly stable in solution, the molecular integrity being preserved.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 38/21; A61K 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/08 (2006.01); A61K 38/21 (2006.01); A61K 47/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/215 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9915193 A1 19990401; AT 224726 T 20021015; AT 274917 T 20040915; AU 741300 B2 20011129; AU 9627698 A 19990412; CA 2304808 A1 19990401; CA 2304808 C 20110322; DE 59805732 D1 20021031; DE 59811910 D1 20041007; DK 1017413 T3 20030203; DK 1017413 T4 20080325; EP 1017413 A1 20000712; EP 1017413 B1 20020925; EP 1017413 B2 20071107; EP 1224940 A1 20020724; EP 1224940 A8 20021120; EP 1224940 B1 20040901; EP 1224940 B2 20100811; EP 1426058 A2 20040609; EP 1426058 A3 20040728; ES 2181281 T3 20030216; ES 2181281 T5 20080416; ES 2223017 T3 20050216; ES 2223017 T5 20101015; IL 135186 A 20121231; IL 135186 D0 20010520; IL 211048 A 20121231; JP 2001517635 A 20011009; JP 4293497 B2 20090708; KR 100711990 B1 20070502; KR 100826621 B1 20080502; KR 20010015599 A 20010226; KR 20060088910 A 20060807; PT 1017413 E 20030228; PT 1224940 E 20050131; US 2005186177 A1 20050825; US 6923956 B1 20050802; US 8337826 B2 20121225

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20170911

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20171025

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-11-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20170928

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20170922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-11-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170715

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20170921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170926

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20170919

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170928

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20170914

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-09-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-09-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-09-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-07-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: HOLBEINSTRASSE 36-38, 4051 BASEL (CH)

2010-11-23 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

2010-11-17 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2010-10-25 [REG DK T4] TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT

2010-10-21 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20100402159

2010-10-15 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2010-08-13 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2010-08-11 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20100811

2010-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: RENTSCHLER BIOTECHNOLOGIE GMBH

- Free text: RENTSCHLER BIOTECHNOLOGIE GMBH#ERWIN-RENTSCHLER-STRASSE 21#88471 LAUPHEIM (DE) -TRANSFER TO- RENTSCHLER BIOTECHNOLOGIE GMBH#ERWIN-RENTSCHLER-STRASSE 21#88471 LAUPHEIM (DE)

2005-10-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: BIOCEUTICALS ARZNEIMITTEL AG

2005-10-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: BIOGENERIX AG

2005-07-27 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BIOCEUTICALS ARZNEIMITTEL AG

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-07-27 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BIOGENERIX AG

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-07-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2223017 T3

2005-01-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Effective date: 20041118

2004-12-21 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-11-24 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20040403168

2004-10-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59811910 P 20041007

2004-10-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-09-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2004-09-01 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1017413 P

2004-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-09-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-04-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: RENTSCHLER BIOTECHNOLOGIE GMBH

2003-04-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030122

2002-07-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TSCHOEPE, MICHAEL

2002-07-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SIKLOSI, THOMAS

2002-07-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHROEDER, PETER

2002-07-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HOFER, HANS

2002-07-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020304

2002-07-24 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1017413

2002-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE