Global Patent Index - EP 1225331 A3

EP 1225331 A3 2003-06-11 - Cylinder barrel for hydrostatic axial piston machines

Title (en)

Cylinder barrel for hydrostatic axial piston machines

Title (de)

Zylindertrommel für hydrostatische Axialkolbenmaschinen

Title (fr)

Tambour de cylindre pour machine hydrostatique à pistons axiaux

Publication

EP 1225331 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01129518 A

Priority

  • DE 10102988 A
  • DE 10106873 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1225331A2] The cylinder drum (1) has round the circumference cooling ribs (10) which during operation of the piston engine project at least in part into the leakage volume which is formed inside a housing which contains the drum. The cooling ribs can be formed as grooves whose depth is less than the smallest wall thickness corresponding to a groove between the rotor bush (7) and the radial outer extension of the drum.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 1/20; F04B 53/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/20 (2006.01); F04B 53/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/2035 (2013.01); F04B 53/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1225331 A2 20020724; EP 1225331 A3 20030611

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081218

2008-09-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080807

2004-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2003-10-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-07-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI