Global Patent Index - EP 1225398 A3

EP 1225398 A3 2002-09-11 - Dehumidifier for air conditioning panels

Title (en)

Dehumidifier for air conditioning panels

Title (de)

Entfeuchter für die Platten einer Klimaanlage

Title (fr)

Déshumidificateur pour panneaux de climatisation

Publication

EP 1225398 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 02405026 A

Priority

CH 772001 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1225398A2] The slide board has one or more skids (2) and at least one standing surface (4) and one holding element (11) for holding the user standing thereon. The skid and standing surface can be integrated or separate parts. A steering handle and brake can be fitted.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 3/14; F24F 5/00; F24F 13/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 5/00 (2006.01); F24F 13/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 5/0089 (2013.01); F24F 5/0042 (2013.01); F24F 5/0092 (2013.01); F24F 13/222 (2013.01); F24F 2003/1667 (2013.01); F24F 2140/30 (2018.01); F24F 2221/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1225398 A2 20020724; EP 1225398 A3 20020911

INPADOC legal status


2006-09-27 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060407

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-02-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-07-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI