Global Patent Index - EP 1226600 B1

EP 1226600 B1 2003-06-04 - ELECTRIC PROTECTIVE SWITCHING DEVICE

Title (en)

ELECTRIC PROTECTIVE SWITCHING DEVICE

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCHES SCHUTZSCHALTGERÄT

Title (fr)

DISJONCTEUR DE PROTECTION ELECTRIQUE

Publication

EP 1226600 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 00966009 A

Priority

  • DE 19952179 A
  • EP 0008982 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19952179A1] The invention relates to an electric safety switch device comprising a housing (12) consisting of insulating material and having receiving pockets (2). Fixing noses (3) of at least one auxiliary block (4) can snap in said noses. The inventive device also comprises at least one tripping device and a support (5) for components. The support is used for various contact and connection components that can be pre-asembled on said support (5). The aim of the invention is to provide a safety switch device that can also be used for auxiliary blocks pertaining to another range of appliances. The aim of the invention is also to easily assemble the individual components. The support (5) for components can be fixed in a switchgear housing as a completely pre-assembled unit. The receiving pockets (2) are arranged on the support (5) for components.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 71/46; H01H 71/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/02 (2006.01); H01H 71/46 (2006.01); H01H 71/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/46 (2013.01); H01H 71/0207 (2013.01); H01H 71/0257 (2013.01); H01H 71/40 (2013.01); H01H 2071/0278 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19952179 A1 20010503; AU 7655900 A 20010514; CN 1192409 C 20050309; CN 1387671 A 20021225; EP 1226600 A2 20020731; EP 1226600 B1 20030604; WO 0133597 A2 20010510; WO 0133597 A3 20011220

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170928

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170823

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-06-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-03-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-12-03 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-11-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-09-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030915

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50002489 P 20030710

2003-07-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-06-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-03-26 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ELECTRIC PROTECTIVE SWITCHING DEVICE

2002-07-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020510

2002-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI