Global Patent Index - EP 1227060 A3

EP 1227060 A3 2004-12-29 - Micromechanical device and process for its manufacture

Title (en)

Micromechanical device and process for its manufacture

Title (de)

Mikromechanisches Bauelement und entsprechendes Herstellungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Dispositf microméchanique et son procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1227060 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01123641 A

Priority

DE 10103399 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1227060A2] The micromechanical component has a substrate in which at least two current channels (10, 10') are provided. The channels have a common input (5) and then branch out separately. The input has a branching with a peak (P) where the inner walls of the channels separate. A first electrode (20) is provided to apply a first electric potential to the inner walls of the channels. A second electrode (30) applies a second electric potential to the outer walls of the channels. The channels may then recombine to have a commom output. Independent claims also cover a method of manufacturing the components by etching.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B81B 1/00; F04B 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B81B 1/00 (2006.01); F04B 17/00 (2006.01); F04B 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 19/006 (2013.01); F04B 17/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] WO 9639252 A1 19961212 - SARNOFF DAVID RES CENTER [US]
  • [Y] WO 0011477 A1 20000302 - SIEMENS AG [DE], et al
  • [E] WO 0236484 A1 20020510 - BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al
  • [Y] US 5482598 A 19960109 - ISAKA KAZUO [JP], et al
  • [XY] MORISHIMA K ET AL: "Noncontact transportation of DNA molecule by dielectrophoretic force", MHS'95. IEEE PROCEEDINGS OF THE SIXTH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON MICRO MACHINE AND HUMAN SCIENCE (CAT. NO.95TH8079) 4-6 OCT. 1995, NAGOYA, JAPAN, 1995, NEW YORK, NY, USA, pages 145 - 152, XP010159960, ISBN: 0-7803-2676-8
  • [A] MORISHIMA K ET AL: "Microflow system and transportation of DNA molecule by dielectrophoretic force utilizing the conformational transition in the higher order structure of DNA molecule", PROCEEDINGS IEEE. THE TENTH ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON MICRO ELECTRO MECHANICAL SYSTEMS. AN INVESTIGATION OF MICRO STRUCTURES, SENSORS, ACTUATORS, MACHINES AND ROBOTS (CAT. NO.97CH36021) 26-30 JAN. 1997, NAGOYA, JAPAN, 1997, NEW YORK, NY, USA, pages 389 - 394, XP010216938, ISBN: 0-7803-3744-1
  • [A] TJERKSTRA R W ET AL: "Multi-walled microchannels: free-standing porous silicon membranes for use in mu TAS", JOURNAL OF MICROELECTROMECHANICAL SYSTEMS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, vol. 9, no. 4, December 2000 (2000-12-01), pages 495 - 501, XP002212547, ISSN: 1057-7157

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1227060 A2 20020731; EP 1227060 A3 20041229; EP 1227060 B1 20141210; DE 10103399 A1 20020822

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161002

2017-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161102

2017-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170503

2017-07-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170630

2017-06-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161002

2017-05-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50116438

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151215

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-11-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20150911

2015-10-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-09-11 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 50116438

2015-01-22 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 50116438

- Effective date: 20150122

2014-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2014-12-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2014-10-08 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20140911

2014-06-18 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20140522

2006-11-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050801

2005-09-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-08-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050629

2004-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 81B 1/00 A

2004-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 04B 19/00 B

2002-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-07-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI