Global Patent Index - EP 1227172 A3

EP 1227172 A3 2002-11-27 - Method of reducing plasma charge damage for plasma processes

Title (en)

Method of reducing plasma charge damage for plasma processes

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Reduzierung von plasmaverusachten Schäden in Plasmaprozessen

Title (fr)

Méthode de réduction de dégats induits par un plasma pendant des processus de plasma

Publication

EP 1227172 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01124618 A

Priority

US 77120301 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1227172A2] A method is provided for depositing a thin film on a substrate (612) in a process chamber with reduced incidence of plasma charge damage. A process gas containing a precursor gases suitable for forming a plasma is flowed into a process chamber, and a plasma is generated from the process gas to deposit the thin film on the substrate. The precursor gases are flowed into the process chamber such that the thin film is deposited at the center (616) of the substrate more rapidly than at an edge of the substrate. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 16/455

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 16/52 (2006.01); C23C 16/455 (2006.01); H01L 21/205 (2006.01); H01L 21/302 (2006.01); H01L 21/31 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 37/3244 (2013.01); C23C 16/455 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1227172 A2 20020731; EP 1227172 A3 20021127; JP 2002334871 A 20021122; JP 5004396 B2 20120822; KR 100870853 B1 20081127; KR 20020063140 A 20020801; TW 575893 B 20040211; US 2003024901 A1 20030206; US 2004048492 A1 20040311; US 6660662 B2 20031209; US 7036453 B2 20060502

INPADOC legal status


2014-10-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140501

2007-04-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20051108

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030526

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-07-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI