Global Patent Index - EP 1227221 A3

EP 1227221 A3 2003-06-04 - Unison ring for a turbocharger

Title (en)

Unison ring for a turbocharger

Title (de)

Leitschaufelverstelleinrichtung für einen Turbolader

Title (fr)

Anneau actuateur pour des aubes variables d'une turbosoufflante

Publication

EP 1227221 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 02000913 A

Priority

DE 10104176 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10104176A1] The turbocharger has a carrier plate with guide blades (6) connected to blade levers, and an adjusting ring (1). The ring has noses (10), projecting in axial direction, at least one of which acts for radial guidance of the ring on the blade carrier plate. The noses are positioned within the area of ring apertures holding lever ends. The plate has a radial spherical turning (11) to guide the ring.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 17/16; F02C 6/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 17/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 17/165 (2013.01); F05D 2220/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1227221 A2 20020731; EP 1227221 A3 20030604; EP 1227221 B1 20060412; DE 10104176 A1 20020725; DE 50206348 D1 20060524; US 2002098081 A1 20020725; US 6623240 B2 20030923

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160201

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160116

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160802

2016-10-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160930

2016-09-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160116

2016-08-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50206348

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150331

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150202

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150128

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-01-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070115

2006-11-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-05-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50206348 P 20060524

2006-05-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060412

2006-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-04-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-01-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031121

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-07-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI