Global Patent Index - EP 1227242 A3

EP 1227242 A3 2003-06-11 - Fuel-feed pump

Title (en)

Fuel-feed pump

Title (de)

Kraftstoffförderpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe d'alimentation en carburant

Publication

EP 1227242 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01128495 A

Priority

JP 2001015664 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1227242A2] In order to provide a fluid pump where the discharge amount is stable even when there are pressure fluctuations on the side of an intake line 70, there is provided a forco-feeding pump 90 for taking in fuel from the intake line 70 and discharging fuel towards a discharge line 80, and an opening and closing valve 100 located in such a manner as to provide urging in a direction closing a path of the intake line 70, and opening the path of the discharge line 80 when the pressure of fuel discharged towards the discharge line 80 exceeds a prescribed pressure. At a piston 110 of the opening and closing valve 100, the pressure of fuel within the intake line 70 acts in opposition to the pressure of the discharged fuel. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 49/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 49/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 49/225 (2013.01); F04B 2205/01 (2013.01); F04B 2205/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1227242 A2 20020731; EP 1227242 A3 20030611; EP 1227242 B1 20070117; DE 60126056 D1 20070308; DE 60126056 T2 20070712

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151207

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160701

2016-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151207

2016-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60126056

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141216

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141218

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070117

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070907

2008-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070117

2007-12-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071018

2007-03-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60126056 P 20070308

2007-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-01-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-01-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MIKUNI CORPORATION

2006-08-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F04B 49/22 20060101AFI20060725BHEP

2006-08-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F02M 37/00 20060101ALI20060725BHEP

2006-08-30 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: FUEL SUPPLY SYSTEM

2004-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-12-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031002

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-07-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI