Global Patent Index - EP 1227446 A3

EP 1227446 A3 2002-11-27 - Method and apparatus for document processing

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for document processing

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Dokument-Verarbeitung

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil de traitement de documents

Publication

EP 1227446 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 02008595 A

Priority

  • EP 97927796 A
  • US 1856396 P
  • US 3495497 P
  • US 3834097 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9745810A1] A currency evaluation device (10) for receiving a stack of currency bills and rapidly evaluating all the bills in the stack. The device comprises an input receptacle (12) and a plurality of output receptacles (217a, 217b) for receiving the bills after they have been evaluated. A transport mechanism transports the bills, one at a time, from the input receptacle to the output receptacles along a transport path. A discriminating unit (247) including a detector positioned along the transport path between the input receptacle and the output receptacles evaluates the bills. The discriminating unit determines the denomination of the bills and detects the occurrence of a plurality of error conditions. The evaluation device also comprises an interface (15) that permits a user of the evaluation device to specify how the plurality of error conditions are to be handled.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 7/00; G07D 7/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07D 7/00 (2006.01); G07D 7/04 (2006.01); G07D 7/12 (2006.01); G07D 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 11/0084 (2013.01); G07D 7/00 (2013.01); G07D 11/0054 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9745810 A1 19971204; AU 3216897 A 19980105; CA 2256760 A1 19971204; CA 2256760 C 20091215; DE 69712105 D1 20020523; DE 69712105 T2 20020822; DE 69737666 D1 20070606; DE 69737666 T2 20070816; EP 0952556 A2 19991027; EP 0952556 A3 19991103; EP 0960399 A1 19991201; EP 0960399 A4 19991201; EP 0960399 B1 20020417; EP 0960399 B2 20100303; EP 1168254 A2 20020102; EP 1168254 A3 20020206; EP 1227446 A2 20020731; EP 1227446 A3 20021127; EP 1227446 B1 20070425; EP 1227446 B2 20151111

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170527

2017-06-21 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170527

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-11 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20151111

2015-11-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2015-11-11 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 69737666

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090528

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080514

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100129

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080530

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080605

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-02-27 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH

- Effective date: 20080117

2008-02-27 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: DE LA RUE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

- Effective date: 20080122

2007-10-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-08-08 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STROMME, LARS, R.

2007-08-08 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CSULITS, FRANK, M.

2007-08-08 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GRAVES, BRADFORD, T.

2007-08-08 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JONES, WILLIAM, J.

2007-08-08 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KLEIN, ROBERT, L.

2007-08-08 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MAZUR, RICHARD, A.

2007-08-08 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MENNIE, DOUGLAS, U.

2007-08-08 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHREITER, HEINZ, W.

2007-08-08 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ANDERSON, MATTHEW, L.

2007-08-08 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MUNRO, MARK, C.

2007-06-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69737666 P 20070606

2007-04-25 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0960399 P

2007-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-04-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-08-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-03-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030103

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-09-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STROMME, LARS, R.

2002-09-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CSULITS, FRANK, M.

2002-09-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GRAVES, BRADFORD, T.

2002-09-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JONES, WILLIAM, J.

2002-09-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KLEIN, ROBERT, L.

2002-09-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MAZUR, RICHARD, A.

2002-09-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MENNIE, DOUGLAS, U.

2002-09-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHREITER, HEINZ, W.

2002-07-31 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 960399

2002-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT