Global Patent Index - EP 1227715 A4

EP 1227715 A4 2004-12-15 - METHODS FOR STABILIZING AND CONTROLLING APOMIXIS

Title (en)

METHODS FOR STABILIZING AND CONTROLLING APOMIXIS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR STABILISIERUNG UND KONTROLLE DER APOMIXIS

Title (fr)

PROCEDES SERVANT A STABILISER ET A CONTROLER L'APOMIXIE

Publication

EP 1227715 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00978296 A

Priority

  • US 0029905 W
  • US 16262699 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0132001A1] The present invention relates to the induction, stabilization, and control of apomixis (asexual seed formation) in angiosperms for the purpose of producing, improving, and economically using superior-yielding agamic crops (crops possessing a capacity for both sexual and apomictic seed production). "Stabilizing" apomixis refers to processes that either convert a facultative apomict to obligate apomixis or confer mechanisms to a facultative apomict that prevent, during facultative sexual seed formation, the recombination of genes that cause apomixis such that progeny produced sexually from said facultative apomict inherit the allelic combinations required for apomixis. More specifically the present invention relates to (i) the production of two or more sets of genetically divergent sexual lines, either inbred or outcrossed, which sets of parental lines remain homozygous for genes that cause apomixis when hybrids are produced by crossing a member of one of such sets of lines with a member of another set, (ii) the hybridization of sexual inbred or outcrossed parental lines to produce apomicts, (iii) the stabilization of such apomicts through cytogenetic or molecular modifications, (iv) the improvement of apomicts by breeding or genetically engineering parental lines or apomicts, (v) the modification of facultative apomicts to abort female meiosis resulting in obligate apomixis except when a recombinant DNA that aborts meiosis is inhibited, and (vi) the modification of facultative apomicts to remain facultative except during inducible expression of a recombinant DNA that causes obligate apomixis by aborting meiosis. The various facets of this biological operating system may be selectively combined for the efficient production, improvement, and use of agamic crops.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/82; A01H 1/02; A01H 1/04; A01H 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01H 1/00 (2006.01); A01H 1/02 (2006.01); A01H 1/04 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A01H 1/04 (2013.01); A01H 1/02 (2013.01); C12N 15/8287 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XD] WO 9833374 A1 19980806 - UNIV UTAH STATE [US]
  • [X] WO 9836090 A1 19980820 - ORSTOM [FR], et al
  • [A] US 5767374 A 19980616 - DE GREEF WILLY [BE], et al
  • [XD] CARMAN JOHN G: "Asynchronous expression of duplicate genes in angiosperms may cause apomixis, bispory, tetraspory, and polyembryony", BIOLOGICAL JOURNAL OF THE LINNEAN SOCIETY, ACADEMIC PRESS, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 61, no. 1, 1997, pages 51 - 94, XP002290847, ISSN: 0024-4066
  • [X] SOKOLOV V A ET AL: "Apomictically reproducing 39-chromosome maize-Tripsacum hybrids", GENETIKA, vol. 34, no. 4, April 1998 (1998-04-01), pages 499 - 506, XP008037214, ISSN: 0016-6758
  • [A] PEEL M D ET AL: "MEIOTIC ANOMALIES IN HYBRIDS BETWEEN WHEAT AND APOMICTIC ELYMUS RECTISETUS (NEES IN LEHM.) A LOEVE & CONNOR", CROP SCIENCE, CROP SCIENCE SOCIETY OF AMERICA, MADISON, WI, US, vol. 37, no. 3, 1997, pages 717 - 723, XP008033523, ISSN: 0011-183X
  • [A] KOLTUNOW A M: "APOMIXIS: EMBRYO SACS AND EMBRYOS FORMED WITHOUT MEIOSIS OR FERTILIZATION IN OVULES", PLANT CELL, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF PLANT PHYSIOLOGISTS, ROCKVILLE, MD, US, vol. 5, 1 October 1993 (1993-10-01), pages 1425 - 1437, XP002040861, ISSN: 1040-4651
  • [A] JEFFERSON R A ET AL: "THE POTENTIAL IMPACTS OF APOMIXIS: A MOLECULAR GENETICS APPROACH", IMPACT OF PLANT MOLECULAR GENETICS, XX, XX, 1996, pages 87 - 101, XP000749968
  • [A] BELOUSOVA N I: "HYBRIDIZATION OF MAIZE WITH TRIPSACUM IN RELATION TO THE PROBLEM OFEXPERIMENTAL INDUCTION OF APOMIXIS IN MAIZE", APOMIXIS AND BREEDING, XX, XX, 1970, pages 199 - 204, XP002925610
  • See also references of WO 0132001A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0132001 A1 20010510; AU 1577201 A 20010514; BR 0015276 A 20020716; CA 2389055 A1 20010510; CN 1391435 A 20030115; EA 006658 B1 20060224; EA 200200507 A1 20021226; EP 1227715 A1 20020807; EP 1227715 A4 20041215; IL 149335 D0 20021110; JP 2003516725 A 20030520; MX PA02004186 A 20021017; NZ 519156 A 20031031

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-12 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1048741

2007-01-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060121

2005-06-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050429

2004-12-15 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20041104

2004-12-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/82 A

2004-12-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 01H 1/02 B

2004-12-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 01H 1/04 B

2004-12-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 01H 5/00 B

2002-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020529

2002-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI