Global Patent Index - EP 1228500 B1

EP 1228500 B1 2003-06-11 - DRUMSTICKS MADE FROM LIQUID CRYSTALLINE POLYMER

Title (en)

DRUMSTICKS MADE FROM LIQUID CRYSTALLINE POLYMER

Title (de)

TROMMELSTÖCKE AUS FLÜSSIGKRISTALLINEM POLYMER

Title (fr)

BAGUETTES DE TAMBOUR CONSTITUEES DE POLYMERES CRISTALLINS LIQUIDES

Publication

EP 1228500 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 00976821 A

Priority

  • US 0030208 W
  • US 16537299 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0135386A1] Drumsticks made from thermotropic liquid crystalline polymers are readily formed, have good playing characteristics, and are durable.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10D 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10D 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10D 13/003 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0135386 A1 20010517; CA 2384743 A1 20010517; DE 60003329 D1 20030717; DE 60003329 T2 20040429; EP 1228500 A1 20020807; EP 1228500 B1 20030611

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051102

2006-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060601

2005-11-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051102

2005-11-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051102

2004-11-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041109

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-10-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041028

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-10-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041027

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-08-25 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-03-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60003329 P 20030717

2003-07-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020408

2002-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR