Global Patent Index - EP 1228734 A3

EP 1228734 A3 2003-06-11 - Crumb collecting brush

Title (en)

Crumb collecting brush

Title (de)

Tisch-Besen

Title (fr)

Ramasse-miettes

Publication

EP 1228734 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 02001114 A

Priority

IT MI20010193 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1228734A2] A crumb collecting brush (1) with improved means for retaining collected dirt, comprising a base body (2) that can be closed by a cover. The base body forms an opening (7) for accommodating a rotatably supported brush roller (10). Means (40) are further provided for cleaning the brush roller which are suitable to produce a gradual radial compression of the surface of the brush roller (10) with a subsequent radial expansion in order to propel the collected dirt toward a collection region formed by the base body. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 13/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 11/33 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 11/4041 (2013.01); A47L 11/33 (2013.01); A47L 11/4013 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1228734 A2 20020807; EP 1228734 A3 20030611; IT MI20010193 A1 20020801

INPADOC legal status


2007-02-14 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060825

2004-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031127

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-08-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI