Global Patent Index - EP 1228796 A3

EP 1228796 A3 2002-09-18 - Combination of an electronic talking toy and a doll or action figure

Title (en)

Combination of an electronic talking toy and a doll or action figure

Title (de)

Kombination von einem elektronischen sprechenden Spielzeug und einer Puppe oder Spielzeugfigur

Title (fr)

Combinaison d'un jouet parlant électronique et d'une poupée ou figurine

Publication

EP 1228796 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 02001999 A

Priority

US 26589801 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1228796A2] An electronic toy (1) adapted to receive a toy figure (3) comprises a source of electrical power (5), an integrated circuit chip (8) programmed with pre-recorded sounds, sound reproduction means (9A,9B) under the control of the integrated circuit chip (8), switch means (12) adapted to open or close an electrical circuit to control the flow of electrical power from the source of electrical power (5) to the integrated circuit (8) and sound reproduction means (9A,9B), and trigger means (13) adapted to activate the switch means (12), such that when the toy figure (3) is placed into contact with the trigger means (13), the switch means (12) is closed to create an electrical circuit and sounds are generated by the sound reproduction means (9A,9B) under the control of the integrated circuit (8). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63H 5/00; A63H 3/28; A63H 3/33; A63H 17/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63H 5/00 (2006.01); A63H 3/00 (2006.01); A63H 3/18 (2006.01); A63H 3/28 (2006.01); A63H 3/33 (2006.01); A63H 17/00 (2006.01); A63H 17/26 (2006.01); A63H 33/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63H 3/28 (2013.01); A63H 17/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1228796 A2 20020807; EP 1228796 A3 20020918; EP 1228796 B1 20040728; CA 2370352 A1 20020805; JP 2002239255 A 20020827

INPADOC legal status


2006-10-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060205

2006-02-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060205

2005-07-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-07-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050429

2004-08-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

2004-07-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-07-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040728

2004-07-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040728

2003-08-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030702

2003-07-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

2003-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030312

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-08-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI