Global Patent Index - EP 1228971 A3

EP 1228971 A3 2002-09-18 - Package for goods with an insert

Title (en)

Package for goods with an insert

Title (de)

Verpackung für Güter mit einer Beilage

Title (fr)

Emballage pour produits accompagnés d'un article supplémentaire

Publication

EP 1228971 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01122826 A

Priority

DE 20101046 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1228971A2] The package is stamped out of a section (1) of cardboard to form top and side tabs (13,14) folded from a base surface (3). Wing-flaps (5) shaping the interior and enveloping the goods (4) overlap each other on the base surface. At least one residual cube-shaped volume (17) for the accessories (18) is partitioned off between the interior and the top and side tabs. The wing flaps consist of Z shaped pieces with a bridge piece (7) at right angles to the base surface and two strap surfaces (6,8).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 5/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/02 (2006.01); B65D 5/18 (2006.01); B65D 5/4805 (2006.01); B65D 5/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/5028 (2013.01); B65D 5/0245 (2013.01); B65D 5/18 (2013.01); B65D 5/48016 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20115620 U1 20011213; EP 1228971 A2 20020807; EP 1228971 A3 20020918

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030319

2003-07-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-08-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI