Global Patent Index - EP 1229243 A3

EP 1229243 A3 2002-11-20 - Enclosure for an air compressor

Title (en)

Enclosure for an air compressor

Title (de)

Gekapselte Verdichteranlage

Title (fr)

Compresseur encapsulé

Publication

EP 1229243 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 02250734 A

Priority

  • US 77721001 A
  • US 4552101 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1229243A2] An air compressor unit having an enclosure that permits adequate cooling air flow, and reduces the amount of noise that emanates from the air compressor unit. The enclosure has a partition that separates the interior of the enclosure into two compartments: a discharge compartment and a component compartment. A discharge aperture is in fluid flow communication with the discharge compartment. A compressor and motor are contained in the component compartment. The component compartment may be separated in a first compartment and a second compartment. Inlets allow cooling air to enter the enclosure, and a discharge aperture permits the cooling air to exit the enclosure. A blower draws cooling air into the enclosure through the inlets. An aftercooler is located between the compressor and the discharge aperture. The enclosure and compartments are configured to reduce the amount of direct "line of sight" noise that emanates from the air compressor unit. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 41/00; F04B 39/00; F04C 23/00; F04C 29/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 39/00 (2006.01); F04B 39/06 (2006.01); F04C 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 39/0033 (2013.01); F04B 39/0038 (2013.01); F04B 39/066 (2013.01); F04C 23/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1229243 A2 20020807; EP 1229243 A3 20021120

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-16 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050901

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-07-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030519

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 04B 41/00 A, 7F 04B 39/00 B, 7F 04C 29/04 B, 7F 04C 23/00 B

2002-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-08-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI