Global Patent Index - EP 1230353 A4

EP 1230353 A4 2002-11-06 - BIFUNCTIONAL MOLECULES AND THEIR USE IN THE DISRUPTION OF PROTEIN-PROTEIN INTERACTIONS

Title (en)

BIFUNCTIONAL MOLECULES AND THEIR USE IN THE DISRUPTION OF PROTEIN-PROTEIN INTERACTIONS

Title (de)

BIFUNKTIONELLE MOLEKÜLE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG BEI DER ZERSTÖRUNG VON PROTEIN-PROTEIN-INTERAKTIONEN

Title (fr)

MOLECULES BIFONCTIONNELLES ET LEUR UTILISATION POUR INHIBER DES INTERACTIONS PROTEINE-PROTEINE

Publication

EP 1230353 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00980512 A

Priority

  • US 0031695 W
  • US 16667599 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0136612A1] Bifunctional inhibitor molecules and methods for their use in the inhibition of protein-protein interactions are provided. The subject bifunctional inhibitor molecules are conjugates of a target protein ligand and a blocking protein ligand, where these two moieties are optionally joined by a linking group. In the subject methods, an effective amount of the bifunctional inhibitor molecule is administered to a host in which the inhibition of a protein-protein interaction is desired. The bifunctional inhibitor molecule simultaneously binds to its corresponding target and blocking proteins to produce a tripartite complex that inhibits the target protein-protein interaction. The subject methods and compositions find use in a variety of applications, including therapeutic applications.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 9/99; C12N 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 47/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 47/62 (2017.08)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0136612 A1 20010525; AU 1776501 A 20010530; EP 1230353 A1 20020814; EP 1230353 A4 20021106

INPADOC legal status


2007-11-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070519

2007-02-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060524

2002-12-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-06 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020506

2002-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI