Global Patent Index - EP 1230938 A8

EP 1230938 A8 2002-11-20 - VITAL TISSUE FOR TENDON OR LIGAMENT AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME

Title (en)

VITAL TISSUE FOR TENDON OR LIGAMENT AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME

Title (de)

LEBENDES GEWEBE FÜR SEHNEN UND BÄNDER UND EIN HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR

Title (fr)

TISSU VITAL POUR TENDON ET LIGAMENT ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION CORRESPONDANT

Publication

EP 1230938 A8 (EN)

Application

EP 00970062 A

Priority

  • JP 0007461 W
  • JP 32375399 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1230938A1] A biocompatible tissue for tendons or ligaments which enables rapid postoperative fixation to bone and early recovery owing to its enhanced biocompatibility and a method for producing such tissue. The biocompatible tissue for tendons or ligaments includes a tendon or ligament tissue substrate and a calcium phosphate compound. The calcium phosphate compound is fixed at least to a surface of the tendon or ligament tissue substrate. The method includes the step of alternately immersing the substrate in a calcium solution and in a phosphate solution to produce and fix the calcium phosphate compound.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61L 27/32; A61F 2/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61L 27/00 (2006.01); A61F 2/08 (2006.01); A61L 27/32 (2006.01); A61L 27/36 (2006.01); A61L 27/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61L 27/3604 (2013.01); A61F 2/08 (2013.01); A61L 27/32 (2013.01); A61L 27/3662 (2013.01); A61L 27/50 (2013.01); A61L 2430/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1230938 A1 20020814; EP 1230938 A4 20030521; EP 1230938 A8 20021120; EP 1230938 B1 20050720; CA 2390099 A1 20010525; CA 2390099 C 20100112; DE 60021412 D1 20050825; DE 60021412 T2 20060524; JP 2001137329 A 20010522; WO 0136012 A1 20010525

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131031

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-08-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140630

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131025

2014-07-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60021412

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131025

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121024

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121017

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121018

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-06-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060421

2006-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-08-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60021412 P 20050825

2005-07-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-07-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-07-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TANAKA, JUNZO,NAT. INST. OF MATERIALS SCIENCE

2005-07-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KIKUCHI, MASANORI,NAT. INST. OF MATERIALS SCIENCE

2005-07-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FUKUZAKI, HIRONOBU

2005-07-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: YAMAGUCHI, ISAMU103, MIZUNUKI SHATAKU

2005-07-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KATO, KENJIC/O NOF CORPORATION

2005-07-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SONODA, KENSAKUC/O NOF CORPORATION

2005-05-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TANAKA, JUNZO,NAT. INST. OF MATERIALS SCIENCE

2005-05-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KIKUCHI, MASANORI,NAT. INST. OF MATERIALS SCIENCE

2005-05-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FUKUZAKI, HIRONOBU

2005-05-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: YAMAGUCHI, ISAMU301, MIZUNUKI SHATAKU

2005-05-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KATO, KENJIC/O NOF CORPORATION

2005-05-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SONODA, KENSAKUC/O NOF CORPORATION

2005-02-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI

2003-11-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030922

2003-05-21 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030404

2003-05-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61L 27/32 A

2003-05-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61F 2/08 B

2003-05-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61L 27/38 B

2002-11-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TANAKA, JUNZO, NAT. INST. OF MATERIALS SCIENCE

2002-11-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KIKUCHI, MASANORI, NAT. INST. OF MATERIALS SCIENC

2002-11-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FUKUZAKI, HIRONOBU

2002-11-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: YAMAGUCHI, ISAMU

2002-11-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KATO, KENJI

2002-11-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SONODA, KENSAKU

2002-09-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NATIONAL INSTITUTE FOR MATERIALS SCIENCE

2002-09-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TAKI CHEMICAL CO., LTD.

2002-09-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOF CORPORATION

2002-09-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TANAKA, JUNZO

2002-09-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KIKUCHI, MASANORI

2002-09-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FUKUZAKI, HIRONOBU

2002-09-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: YAMAGUCHI, ISAMU

2002-09-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KATO, KENJI

2002-09-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SONODA, KENSAKU

2002-08-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020524

2002-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE