Global Patent Index - EP 1231003 B1

EP 1231003 B1 2009-02-25 - Process for preparing an article of soft magnetic composite material

Title (en)

Process for preparing an article of soft magnetic composite material

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Formteils aus einem weichmagnetischen Verbundwerkstoff

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'un article en un matériau composite magnétiquement doux

Publication

EP 1231003 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 02001397 A

Priority

DE 10106172 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1231003A2] In the production of a molding of soft magnetic composite material by (a) preparing a mixture of iron powder and pressing aid, (b) pressing to a molding and (c) tempering, the novelty is that tempering is carried out in an inert gas containing 10-1 vol.% oxygen. An Independent claim is also included for the production of a molding of this type by steps (a), (b) and (c), in which molding and tempering are repeated after the tempering stage.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22F 3/12 (2006.01); B22F 3/10 (2006.01); C21D 1/76 (2006.01); C21D 8/12 (2006.01); C22C 33/02 (2006.01); H01F 1/24 (2006.01); H01F 41/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 33/02 (2013.01); B22F 3/1007 (2013.01); C21D 1/76 (2013.01); H01F 41/0246 (2013.01); B22F 2003/023 (2013.01); B22F 2003/241 (2013.01); B22F 2003/247 (2013.01); B22F 2998/00 (2013.01); B22F 2998/10 (2013.01); B22F 2999/00 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B22F 2998/00 + B22F 1/0088
  2. B22F 2998/10 + B22F 3/02 + B22F 3/1007 + B22F 3/16
  3. B22F 2999/00 + B22F 3/16 + B22F 3/02 + B22F 3/1007
  4. B22F 2999/00 + B22F 3/1007 + B22F 2201/10 + B22F 2201/03
  5. B22F 2999/00 + B22F 3/1007 + B22F 2201/02 + B22F 2201/03

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1231003 A2 20020814; EP 1231003 A3 20050720; EP 1231003 B1 20090225; DE 10106172 A1 20020829; DE 50213306 D1 20090409; US 2002135089 A1 20020926; US 7175794 B2 20070213

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180308

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150202

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150119

2015-10-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150930

2015-09-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150119

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140123

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140124

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-02-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091126

2009-04-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50213306 P 20090409

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-02-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-08-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070201

2007-03-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070201

2006-04-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060120

2005-07-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-07-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2005-07-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 22F 3/12 A

2005-07-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 21D 8/12 B

2005-07-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01F 41/02 B

2005-07-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01F 1/24 B

2005-07-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 22C 33/02 B

2002-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-08-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI