Global Patent Index - EP 1231184 A9

EP 1231184 A9 2002-11-20 - A method and apparatus for preheating of a fuel cell micro-reformer

Title (en)

A method and apparatus for preheating of a fuel cell micro-reformer

Title (de)

Methode und Vorrichtung zum Vorwärmen eines Mikroreformers für eine Brennstoffzelle

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif de préchauffage d'un microdispositif d'une pile à combustible

Publication

EP 1231184 A9 (EN)

Application

EP 02075183 A

Priority

US 78262101 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1231184A2] An apparatus and method for a preheated micro-reformer system is disclosed comprising a reformer (42) and a micro-reformer (44) fluidly coupled to the reformer (42). The micro-reformer (44) being electrically preheatable. An apparatus comprising a micro-reformer (44) including a first zone (76) and a second zone (78), the first zone (76) being preheatable to a first temperature and the second zone (78) being preheatable to a second temperature, the second temperature being higher than the first temperature. A method of using a micro-reformer (44) that is electrically preheatable is disclosed comprising initiating an electrically preheatable micro-reformer (44). The micro-reformer (44) is preheated. The preheating can be accomplished by converting electrical energy (56) into thermal energy (66). A method of using a preheated micro-reformer (44) is disclosed comprising preheating a first zone (76), preheating a second zone (78) to a temperature higher than the first zone (76), vaporizing a fuel air mixture (60) in the first zone (76), and reforming the fuel air mixture (60) in the second zone (78).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C01B 3/38; C01B 3/32; B01J 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 19/00 (2006.01); C01B 3/32 (2006.01); C01B 3/38 (2006.01); H01M 8/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01J 19/0093 (2013.01); C01B 3/323 (2013.01); C01B 3/382 (2013.01); C01B 3/384 (2013.01); H01M 8/0612 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00135 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00159 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00788 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00824 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00835 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00844 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00873 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00889 (2013.01); B01J 2219/0095 (2013.01); C01B 2203/0811 (2013.01); C01B 2203/0816 (2013.01); C01B 2203/085 (2013.01); C01B 2203/0866 (2013.01); C01B 2203/142 (2013.01); Y02P 20/129 (2015.11)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1231184 A2 20020814; EP 1231184 A3 20060719; EP 1231184 A9 20021120; US 2002110507 A1 20020815; US 6929785 B2 20050816

INPADOC legal status


2009-07-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090120

2008-10-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080909

2007-03-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070119

2006-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-03-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 01B 3/32 A

2004-03-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 01B 3/38 B

2004-03-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 01J 19/00 B

2003-01-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GRIEVE, MALCOLM JAMES

2003-01-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHUMANN, DAVID ROBERT

2003-01-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KIRWAN, JOHN E.

2003-01-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: QUADER, ATHER A.

2003-01-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FISHER, GALEN BRUCE

2002-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-08-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI