Global Patent Index - EP 1231472 A9

EP 1231472 A9 2002-12-18 - Integrated fluid delivery and analysis system

Title (en)

Integrated fluid delivery and analysis system

Title (de)

Integriertes System zur Flüssigkeitsabgabe und Analyse

Title (fr)

Système intégré de distribution de fluide et d'analyse

Publication

EP 1231472 A9 (EN)

Application

EP 02250913 A

Priority

  • US 6141602 A
  • US 26763901 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1231472A1] An integrated fluid delivery and analysis system and components thereof for preparing and/or analyzing samples. The components may include a transport module, a fluidics module, and an analysis module, among others. The system comprises a detection device (1201) configured to detect light from a sample at an examination site, a sample delivery axis extending substantially vertically from the examination site (1604); and at least one material exchange station (1600) along the sample delivery axis above the examination site. Typically, there are: a fluidics head assembly including a dispensing device; a drive mechanism connected to the head assembly for moving the head assembly along a substantially vertical sample delivery axis; and at least two material exchange stations (1600,1602) located along the sample delivery axis, the head assembly being moveable to each material exchange station (1600,1602) to pick up or deposit materials used to conduct an assay. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 35/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 21/25 (2006.01); G01N 35/02 (2006.01); G01N 35/00 (2006.01); G01N 35/04 (2006.01); G01N 35/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 21/253 (2013.01); G01N 35/028 (2013.01); G01N 35/1065 (2013.01); G01N 35/109 (2013.01); G01N 2035/00326 (2013.01); G01N 2035/00356 (2013.01); G01N 2035/00455 (2013.01); G01N 2035/0498 (2013.01); G01N 2035/103 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1231472 A1 20020814; EP 1231472 A9 20021218; EP 1231472 B1 20080102; AT 382857 T 20080115; DE 60224312 D1 20080214

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180227

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: HOLEESTRASSE 87, 4054 BASEL (CH)

2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180227

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180227

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180227

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-02-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-02-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-05-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60224312

- Representative's name: SCHWABE SANDMAIR MARX PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANW, DE

2016-02-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080403

2010-08-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080102

2010-07-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080211

2009-11-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080102

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080102

2009-01-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080211

2008-12-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20081003

2008-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080102

2008-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080228

2008-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080402

2008-09-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080602

2008-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080102

2008-09-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080102

2008-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080413

2008-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080102

2008-07-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2008-06-02 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: MDS ANALYTICAL TECHNOLOGIES (US) INC.

- Effective date: 20080326

2008-05-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080102

2008-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BRAUNPAT BRAUN EDER AG

2008-03-26 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MDS ANALYTICAL TECHNOLOGIES (US) INC.

2008-02-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60224312 P 20080214

2008-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-01-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2008-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2008-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2008-01-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-08-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01N 21/25 20060101AFI20070706BHEP

2007-08-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01N 35/02 20060101ALI20070706BHEP

2004-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040312

2003-05-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-07 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030131

- Countries: AL

2003-05-07 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030131

- Countries: LT

2003-05-07 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030131

- Countries: LV

2003-05-07 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030131

- Countries: MK

2003-05-07 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030131

- Countries: RO

2003-05-07 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030131

- Countries: SI

2003-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030131

2002-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-08-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI