Global Patent Index - EP 1232247 A4

EP 1232247 A4 2003-06-18 - MODULATION OF SIGNAL TRANSDUCTION

Title (en)

MODULATION OF SIGNAL TRANSDUCTION

Title (de)

MODULATION DER SIGNALTRANSDUKTION

Title (fr)

MODULATION DE TRANSDUCTION DE SIGNAL

Publication

EP 1232247 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00991029 A

Priority

  • US 0042233 W
  • US 16743899 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0138344A2] A polypeptide is identified as being functionally included in a signal transduction pathway having a biological effect. Contemplated polypeptides are different from a retinoic acid receptor, a retinoid X receptor, or a cellular retinoic acid binding protein, however, binding of the retinoid or retinoid metabolite lead to a modulation of the biological effect. In particularly contemplated methods, a retinoid or retinoid metabolite is administered to a cell or mammal in a concentration effective to modulate the biological effect.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 5/06; A61K 31/07; A61K 31/203

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 5/02 (2006.01); A61K 31/203 (2006.01); A61K 31/255 (2006.01); A61K 31/265 (2006.01); A61K 49/00 (2006.01); A61P 3/10 (2006.01); A61P 5/48 (2006.01); A61P 9/06 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C12N 5/00 (2006.01); G01N 33/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 49/0008 (2013.01); A61K 31/203 (2013.01); G01N 33/5005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] SUCOV H M ET AL: "RETINOIC ACID AND RETINOIC ACID RECEPTORS IN DEVELOPMENT", MOLECULAR NEUROBIOLOGY, HUMANA PRESS, US, vol. 10, no. 2/3, 1995, pages 169 - 184, XP002949771, ISSN: 0893-7648
  • See also references of WO 0138344A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0138344 A2 20010531; WO 0138344 A3 20020110; AU 3082901 A 20010604; CA 2392453 A1 20010531; CA 2392453 C 20120320; EP 1232247 A2 20020821; EP 1232247 A4 20030618; JP 2003518017 A 20030603

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-13 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130601

2009-03-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GRAUPNER, GERHART

2009-03-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GRAUPNER, GERHART

2008-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080716

2003-06-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030506

2003-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 5/06 A

2003-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/07 B

2003-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/203 B

2002-08-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020617

2002-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-08-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI