Global Patent Index - EP 1232875 A8

EP 1232875 A8 2002-11-20 - Tissue paper used for heat-sensitive stencil sheet, heat-sensitive stencil sheet, and method of making the same

Title (en)

Tissue paper used for heat-sensitive stencil sheet, heat-sensitive stencil sheet, and method of making the same

Title (de)

Seidenpapier zu einem wärmeempfindlichen Schablonenblatt, wärmeempfindliches Schablonenblatt, und Herstellungsverfahren dafür

Title (fr)

Papier de soie pour une feuille stencil sensible à la chaleur, feuille stencil sensible à la chaleur et procédé de sa fabrication

Publication

EP 1232875 A8 (EN)

Application

EP 02003357 A

Priority

  • JP 2001037652 A
  • JP 2002024816 A
  • JP 2002035712 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1232875A1] A tissue paper used for heat-sensitive stencil sheet to be used for a heat-sensitive stencil sheet comprising natural fibers, synthetic fibers, or their mixture, which being impregnated with an ionizing radiation-curable type of resin, and a heat-sensitive stencil sheet having a thermoplastic resin film being bonded thereto, wherein, at surface of one side of the resin film, there is provided the tissue paper used for heat-sensitive stencil sheet, which is that being bonded the thermoplastic resin film by point-bonding with using an ionizing radiation-curable resin, and there is provided an anti-sticking layer on the other side of the thermoplastic resin film.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41N 1/24; D21H 25/06; D21H 27/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41C 1/14 (2006.01); B41N 1/24 (2006.01); D21H 19/16 (2006.01); D21H 25/06 (2006.01); D21H 27/00 (2006.01); D21H 27/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41N 1/241 (2013.01); B41N 1/243 (2013.01); D21H 25/06 (2013.01); D21H 27/30 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24802 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24826 (2013.01); Y10T 428/249924 (2015.04); Y10T 428/249953 (2015.04); Y10T 428/249959 (2015.04); Y10T 428/31993 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1232875 A1 20020821; EP 1232875 A8 20021120; EP 1232875 B1 20060823; DE 60214058 D1 20061005; DE 60214058 T2 20070215; JP 2003291556 A 20031015; JP 3739085 B2 20060125; US 2003031855 A1 20030213; US 2003150576 A1 20030814; US 2005089703 A1 20050428; US 6866924 B2 20050315; US 6946049 B2 20050920

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170213

2018-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170228

2018-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170901

2017-12-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20171031

2017-10-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170213

2017-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60214058

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-02-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-02-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60214058

- Representative's name: MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER GBR, DE

2014-01-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60214058

- Representative's name: MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER GBR, DE

2014-01-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60214058

- Representative's name: MEISSNER BOLTE PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELTE P, DE

2013-09-11 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20130815 AND 20130821

2013-08-22 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: RICOH COMPANY, LTD., JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: RICOH CO., LTD., RICOH COMPANY, LTD., , JP

- Document: DE 60214058

- Effective date: 20130719

2013-08-22 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: RICOH COMPANY, LTD., JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: RICOH CO., LTD., TOHOKU RICOH CO., LTD., , JP

- Document: DE 60214058

- Effective date: 20130702

2013-08-22 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: RICOH COMPANY, LTD., JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: RICOH CO., LTD., TOKYO, JP; TOHOKU RICOH CO., LTD., SHIBATA, MIYAGI, JP

- Document: DE 60214058

- Effective date: 20130702

2013-08-22 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: RICOH COMPANY, LTD., JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: RICOH CO., LTD., TOKYO, JP; RICOH COMPANY, LTD., TOKIO/TOKYO, JP

- Document: DE 60214058

- Effective date: 20130719

2013-08-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60214058

- Representative's name: BARZ, PETER, DIPL.-CHEM. DR.RER.NAT., DE

- Effective date: 20130702

2013-08-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60214058

- Representative's name: BARZ, PETER, DIPL.-CHEM. DR.RER.NAT., DE

- Effective date: 20130719

2013-08-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60214058

- Representative's name: MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER GBR, DE

- Effective date: 20130719

2013-08-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60214058

- Representative's name: MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER GBR, DE

- Effective date: 20130702

2013-08-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60214058

- Representative's name: MEISSNER BOLTE PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELTE P, DE

- Effective date: 20130702

2013-08-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60214058

- Representative's name: MEISSNER BOLTE PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELTE P, DE

- Effective date: 20130719

2013-07-19 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: RICOH COMPANY, LTD., JP

- Effective date: 20130618

2013-07-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60214058

- Representative's name: BARZ, PETER, DIPL.-CHEM. DR.RER.NAT., DE

2007-08-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070524

2007-03-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-10-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60214058 P 20061005

2006-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-08-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-02-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031223

2003-05-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-02-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021211

2002-10-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: RICOH COMPANY LTD.

2002-10-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TOHOKU RICOH CO., LTD.

2002-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-08-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI