Global Patent Index - EP 1233091 A8

EP 1233091 A8 2002-11-20 - Knitted fabric

Title (en)

Knitted fabric

Title (de)

Strickstoff

Title (fr)

Etoffe tricotée

Publication

EP 1233091 A8 (EN)

Application

EP 02251103 A

Priority

GB 0104143 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1233091A1] A knitted fabric comprising a plurality of knitted stitches which are interconnected to define a plurality of courses and wales, the knitted stitches being formed from a heat fusible yarn (14), with at least some of said stitches being formed from said heat fusible yarn plated with a ground yarn (12), the heat fusible yarn (14) being fused together at adjacent points of contact on stitches in order to give the fabric a desired dimensional stability and shape. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 23/0255 (2013.01); D04B 1/16 (2013.01); D10B 2403/0114 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1233091 A1 20020821; EP 1233091 A8 20021120; GB 0104143 D0 20010411; US 2002148258 A1 20021017; US 6588237 B2 20030708

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050901

2003-05-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030213

2002-11-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RATCLIFFE, ANDREW

2002-11-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SHARROCKS, PHILIP

2002-11-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STARBUCK, MICHAEL

2002-11-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: COLE, CLAIRE

2002-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-08-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI