Global Patent Index - EP 1233235 A3

EP 1233235 A3 2002-11-13 - Process and apparatus to reduce acid polluting emissions from industrial units

Title (en)

Process and apparatus to reduce acid polluting emissions from industrial units

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Reduzieren der sauren Schadstoffemissionen von Industrieanlagen

Title (fr)

Procédé et équipement pour la réduction des émissions polluantes de type acides provenant d'installations industrielles

Publication

EP 1233235 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 02003515 A

Priority

  • GR 2001100091 A
  • GR 2001100092 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1233235A2] A process neutralizes Sulfur trioxide gas emissions arising from the combustion of heavy oil. Prior to the combustion process, an emulsion is prepared of fuel oil and a magnesium agent or a magnesium compound, and introduced to the burner. The magnesium agent is in aqueous solution introduced to the heavy oil under pressure and then introduced to the burner as an aerosol in a ring arrangement forming an umbrella profile. The magnesium is introduced as magnesium nitrate or magnesium acetate. An Independent claim is included for a suitable burner assembly with a dosing unit valve (10) and emulsion feed (8) discharging to a burner inlet (9) from an emulsion reservoir (5). The burner further has a compressed air fed system to a jet. The magnesium agent is held ready as a solution in a tank (5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23K 5/12; C10L 1/32; F23J 7/00; F23J 15/00; F23K 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10L 1/32 (2006.01); F23K 5/10 (2006.01); F23K 5/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23K 5/10 (2013.01); C10L 1/328 (2013.01); F23K 5/12 (2013.01); F23K 2301/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1233235 A2 20020821; EP 1233235 A3 20021113; US 2003027089 A1 20030206

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030514

2003-09-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 23K 5/12 A, 7F 23K 5/10 B, 7C 10L 1/32 B, 7F 23J 7/00 B, 7F 23J 15/00 B

2002-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-08-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI