Global Patent Index - EP 1233722 A4

EP 1233722 A4 2003-06-11 - DIFFERENTIALLY EXPANDING STENT AND METHODS OF USE

Title (en)

DIFFERENTIALLY EXPANDING STENT AND METHODS OF USE

Title (de)

UNTERSCHIEDLICH AUSWEITBARER STENT UND GEBRAUCHSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

STENT A EXTENSION DIFFERENTIELLE ET PROCEDES D'UTILISATION ASSOCIES

Publication

EP 1233722 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00966878 A

Priority

  • US 0026378 W
  • US 15561199 P
  • US 66868700 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0121109A1] A stent (10) for placement in a body lumen comprises multiple sections (20, 22, 24). Each of the sections expand at a particular pressure or at a rate in the absence of a constraining pressure. Thus, a predetermind sequence of expansion is provided across the stent.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61F 2/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61F 2/82 (2013.01); A61F 2/856 (2013.01); A61F 2/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61F 2/82 (2013.01); A61F 2/856 (2013.01); A61F 2250/0018 (2013.01); A61F 2250/0039 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0121109 A1 20010329; WO 0121109 A9 20021121; AU 766043 B2 20031009; AU 7715900 A 20010424; CA 2383304 A1 20010329; CN 1391452 A 20030115; EP 1233722 A1 20020828; EP 1233722 A4 20030611; IL 148656 D0 20020912; JP 2003509158 A 20030311; NZ 517945 A 20030926

INPADOC legal status


2009-05-08 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1046843

2005-10-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050401

2003-06-11 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030429

2002-09-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DAVIDSON, CHARLES, J.

2002-09-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VARDI, GIL, M.

2002-09-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WILLIAMS, ERIC

2002-09-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KAO, STEPHEN

2002-09-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DAVIDSON, CHARLES, J.

2002-09-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VARDI, GIL, M.

2002-09-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WILLIAMS, ERIC

2002-09-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KAO, STEPHEN

2002-08-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020327

2002-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20020327;LT PAYMENT 20020327;LV PAYMENT 20020327;MK PAYMENT 20020327;RO PAYMENT 20020327;SI PAYMENT 20020327