Global Patent Index - EP 1234300 B1

EP 1234300 B1 2003-06-04 - METHOD FOR COMPENSATING PERTURBATIONS CAUSED BY DEMULTIPLEXING AN ANALOG SIGNAL IN A MATRIX DISPLAY

Title (en)

METHOD FOR COMPENSATING PERTURBATIONS CAUSED BY DEMULTIPLEXING AN ANALOG SIGNAL IN A MATRIX DISPLAY

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR KOMPENSATION VON DURCH DEMULTIPLEXEN EINES ANALOGEN SIGNALS VERURSACHTEN STÖRUNGEN IN EINER MATRIXANZEIGE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE COMPENSATION DES PERTURBATIONS DUES AU DEMULTIPLEXAGE D'UN SIGNAL ANALOGIQUE DANS UN AFFICHEUR MATRICIEL

Publication

EP 1234300 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 00985336 A

Priority

  • FR 0003307 W
  • FR 9915084 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0141112A2] The invention concerns a method for compensating perturbations caused by demultiplexing an analog signal on a circuit comprising N data lines, wherein the demultiplexing is carried out by sampling-holding circuits whereof the input receives the analog signal and the output is connected to one of the N data lines, the N sampling-holding circuits being controlled successively by a sampling signal (ECHi). When the sampling signal (ECHi) is applied on one of the sampling-holding circuits, an opposite compensation level (V3) lower than the sampling signal level is applied on the N-1 sampling-holding circuits. The invention is particularly applicable to LCD screens.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09G 3/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02F 1/133 (2006.01); G09G 3/20 (2006.01); G09G 3/36 (2006.01); G09G 3/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/3688 (2013.01); G09G 3/2011 (2013.01); G09G 3/3208 (2013.01); G09G 2310/0297 (2013.01); G09G 2310/06 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0209 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0141112 A2 20010607; WO 0141112 A3 20011227; DE 60003225 D1 20030710; DE 60003225 T2 20040429; EP 1234300 A2 20020828; EP 1234300 B1 20030604; FR 2801750 A1 20010601; FR 2801750 B1 20011228; JP 2003515773 A 20030507; JP 4887594 B2 20120229; US 6977638 B1 20051220

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171128

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171122

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-10 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20171214 AND 20171222

2017-11-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-09-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161201

2017-07-05 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161201

2016-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20151110

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-11-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090603

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071122

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-01-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-10-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60003225 P 20030710

2003-07-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020321

2002-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR