Global Patent Index - EP 1234516 A3

EP 1234516 A3 2002-11-13 - Outsole structure of football shoe

Title (en)

Outsole structure of football shoe

Title (de)

Sohlenaufbau für Fussballschuhe

Title (fr)

Semelle extérieure pour chaussure de football

Publication

EP 1234516 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 02250233 A

Priority

JP 2001047881 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1234516A2] An outsole (1) of a soccer spike shoe is formed of six portions, i.e. a heel portion (A), a tread portion (B), a toe portion (C), a midfoot portion (D), an arch portion (E) and a toe root portion (F). The heel portion (A), tread portion (B), toe portion (C) and midfoot portion (D) are made more rigid, and the arch portion (E) and the toe root portion (F) are made less rigid. First to fifth studs (31-35) are provided on a sole surface of the outsole (1). The first stud (31) is disposed at a central portion of a distal phalanx (DP1) of a first or great toe of a shoe wearer's foot. The second stud (32) is positioned at a metatarsophalangeal joint (MJ1) of the first toe. The third stud (33) is placed at a head portion of a metatarsus (MB4) of a fourth toe. The fourth stud (34) is located at a distal phalanx (DP3) of a third toe. The fifth stud (35) is deployed at each head portion of metatarsi (MB2, MB3) of a second and third toe. Thereby, rigidity and strength as well as bendability of the outsole can be achieved. Also, slippage on the contact surfaces can be prevented from occurring during playing soccer. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 5/02; A43B 13/14; A43B 13/16; A43C 15/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/02 (2006.01); A43B 13/14 (2006.01); A43B 13/16 (2006.01); A43B 13/22 (2006.01); A43B 13/26 (2006.01); A43C 15/02 (2006.01); A43C 15/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 1/0072 (2013.01); A43B 5/02 (2013.01); A43B 13/141 (2013.01); A43B 13/16 (2013.01); A43C 15/161 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1234516 A2 20020828; EP 1234516 A3 20021113; EP 1234516 B1 20060830; BR 0200289 A 20021029; DE 60214259 D1 20061012; DE 60214259 T2 20070405; ES 2271190 T3 20070416; JP 2002248006 A 20020903; JP 3827280 B2 20060927

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140114

2015-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140115

2015-05-04 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150504

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140114

2014-11-06 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60214259

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140114

2014-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60214259

2013-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130207

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130109

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130109

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120112

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-08-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2271190 T3

2006-10-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60214259 P 20061012

2006-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2006-08-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060830

2005-08-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050704

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2003-04-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030206

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-08-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI