Global Patent Index - EP 1234601 A3

EP 1234601 A3 2003-06-25 - Uniformly weighted golf ball

Title (en)

Uniformly weighted golf ball

Title (de)

Golfball mit gleichmässiger Dichte

Title (fr)

Balle de golf avec densité uniforme

Publication

EP 1234601 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 02003461 A

Priority

US 67084301 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1234601A2] A golf ball in which the core is made from one material and the cover from a different material yet the density of the core and the density of the cover material are essentially identical. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63B 37/00; A63B 37/12; A63B 69/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 37/00 (2006.01); A63B 37/04 (2006.01); A63B 37/12 (2006.01); A63B 37/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 43/04 (2013.01); A63B 37/0003 (2013.01); A63B 37/0024 (2013.01); A63B 37/0026 (2013.01); A63B 37/0035 (2013.01); A63B 37/0047 (2013.01); A63B 37/0066 (2013.01); A63B 37/02 (2013.01); A63B 37/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1234601 A2 20020828; EP 1234601 A3 20030625; CN 1370610 A 20020925; JP 2002253704 A 20020910; TW 462894 B 20011111

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-13 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031230

2004-04-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-08-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI