Global Patent Index - EP 1234679 A3

EP 1234679 A3 2002-11-27 - Dual inkjet pen carriage system

Title (en)

Dual inkjet pen carriage system

Title (de)

Wagensystem für einen dualen Farbstrahlschreiber

Title (fr)

Système de balayage pour deux dispositifs d'écriture

Publication

EP 1234679 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 02077163 A

Priority

  • EP 00201349 A
  • EP 95307796 A
  • US 39924495 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0729844A1] A dual pen carriage system (50) supports a pair of inkjet pens (60, 62) in an inkjet printing mechanism (20). A carriage body (75) defines a pair of pen chambers (80, 82), separated by a main alignment wall (76), for receiving the pens (60, 62). The main wall (76) defines at least one first direction alignment datum (180, 180', 182, 184; 180', 184, 186, 188) in each chamber (80, 82). A reference rod (190) extends through both chambers (80, 82) to define pen alignment datums in two orthogonal directions, which are orthogonal to the first direction. The body (75) supports an adjustment member (215) that selectively engages a rotational registration member (214) along the main wall (76) to simultaneously adjust the angular alignment of each pen chamber (80, 82). A latch mechanism (70, 72) coupled to the carriage body (75) applies, upon closing, a controlled force to a latching land (115, 155) on each pen (60, 62) to push the pens into contact with the datums (180, 180', 182, 184, 190, 196; 180', 184, 186, 188, 190, 198). A method is also provided for aligning a pair of inkjet pens (60, 62) in an inkjet printing mechanism (20). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 25/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 3/54 (2006.01); B41J 2/01 (2006.01); B41J 2/05 (2006.01); B41J 2/175 (2006.01); B41J 25/304 (2006.01); B41J 25/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/17553 (2013.01); B41J 2/1752 (2013.01); B41J 2/1755 (2013.01); B41J 25/304 (2013.01); B41J 25/34 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0729844 A1 19960904; EP 0729844 B1 20010103; CN 1083340 C 20020424; CN 1138527 A 19961225; DE 69519790 D1 20010208; DE 69519790 T2 20010419; DE 69529779 D1 20030403; DE 69529779 T2 20031127; DE 69534328 D1 20050825; DE 69534328 T2 20060504; EP 1018436 A2 20000712; EP 1018436 A3 20001122; EP 1018436 B1 20030226; EP 1234679 A2 20020828; EP 1234679 A3 20021127; EP 1234679 B1 20050720; JP 3856864 B2 20061213; JP H08244230 A 19960924; KR 100402568 B1 20040309

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071101

2009-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081101

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080603

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071128

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070228

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-06-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060421

2005-08-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69534328 P 20050825

2005-07-20 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1018436 P

2005-07-20 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0729844 P

2005-07-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2005-07-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030805

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2003-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030204

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2002-11-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CHRISTIANSON, JOHN A.

2002-11-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KELLEY, RICHARD ALAN

2002-11-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HARMON, JOHN PAUL

2002-08-28 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 729844

2002-08-28 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1018436

2002-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT