Global Patent Index - EP 1234870 A3

EP 1234870 A3 2002-11-13 - Solid detergent additives, their preparation and use

Title (en)

Solid detergent additives, their preparation and use

Title (de)

Feste Waschmittelzusatzstoffe, deren Herstellung und Verwendung

Title (fr)

Additifs solides pour les détergents, leur préparation et utilisation

Publication

EP 1234870 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 02003091 A

Priority

DE 10108573 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1234870A2] Providing a detergent additive comprises a core of an antifoaming agent and a shell of an anionic surfactant. Detergent additive comprises a core of an antifoaming agent and a shell of an anionic surfactant or a mixture containing an alkali salt of a 1-22C carboxylic acid and/or a nonionic or zwitterionic surfactant(s).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/02 (2006.01); C11D 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 11/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/0026 (2013.01); C11D 1/02 (2013.01); C11D 11/0088 (2013.01); C11D 17/0039 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1234870 A2 20020828; EP 1234870 A3 20021113; DE 10108573 A1 20020912

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031028

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2003-05-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030415

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-08-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020213

2002-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-08-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI