Global Patent Index - EP 1235122 B1

EP 1235122 B1 2003-06-11 - Portable object with means for activating an electronic function and command procedure for such an electronic function

Title (en)

Portable object with means for activating an electronic function and command procedure for such an electronic function

Title (de)

Tragbares Objekt mit Vorrichtungen zur Aktivierung einer elektronischen Funktion sowie Steuerungsverfahren für diese Funktion

Title (fr)

Objet portatif comprenant des moyens pour l'activation d'une fonction électronique et procédé de commande d'une telle fonction électronique

Publication

EP 1235122 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 02075395 A

Priority

  • EP 02075395 A
  • EP 01200694 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1235122A1] Watch (1) comprises a touch sensitive keyboard (16) for selecting electronic functions. An additional strain gauge is used to confirm or activate a selection. Confirmation or activation is achieved by applying pressure to a strain gauge such that it generates a command signal that is applied to the data processing circuit. Confirmation or activation can be accompanied by an audible signal confirming that a chosen function has been triggered. An Independent claim is made for a method of confirming or activating a command selected using a keypad associated with a watch or similar.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04G 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04G 21/00 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04G 21/00 (2013.01)

EPO simple patent family

EP 1235122 A1 20020828; EP 1235122 B1 20030611

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20171222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-12-15 [REG CH PFUS] MERGER

- Owner name: THE SWATCH GROUP RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT LTD , CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ASULAB S.A., CH

2016-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-12-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140131

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121224

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-01-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-11-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031018

2003-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ICB INGENIEURS CONSEILS EN BREVETS SA

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60200003 P 20030717

2003-07-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2003-06-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030611

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-08-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020214

2002-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-08-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI