Global Patent Index - EP 1235225 A3

EP 1235225 A3 2002-09-18 - Method and memory device for sequential memory reading with address jump

Title (en)

Method and memory device for sequential memory reading with address jump

Title (de)

Verfahren und Anordnung für serielle Speicherauslesung mit Adressensprung

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de lecture séquentielle d'une mémoire avec saut d'adresse

Publication

EP 1235225 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 02290278 A

Priority

FR 0102501 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1235225A2] The procedure for sequential reading from a memory (10) uses an incremental address counter (12). An address jump is handled by transferring data to the incremental address counter, in order to control subsequent reading of information from the memory, which uses address jumps. The procedure for sequential reading from a memory (10) makes use of an incremental address counter (12). An address jump is handled as follows. An address jump signal is first detected, and the incremental counter (12) is incremented. The first stage of jump signal detection includes the decoding of an instruction code. The second stage includes incrementing the incremental address counter by at least one unit. The contents (28) of the memory (10) at the incremented address are read, and the read contents are transferred (34,32) to an incremented address within the incremental address counter. The contents (28) of the memory at the address contained within the incremental address counter are then read.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G11C 8/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G11C 11/413 (2006.01); G06F 12/02 (2006.01); G11C 8/04 (2006.01); G11C 11/41 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11C 8/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1235225 A2 20020828; EP 1235225 A3 20020918; FR 2821478 A1 20020830; JP 2002328834 A 20021115; JP 4217803 B2 20090204; US 2002129219 A1 20020912; US 6928530 B2 20050809

INPADOC legal status


2008-09-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080311

2007-11-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071029

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-03-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030123

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-08-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI