Global Patent Index - EP 1235482 A1

EP 1235482 A1 2002-09-04 - NOVEL ANIMAL MODEL OF ALZHEIMER DISEASE WITH AMYLOID PLAQUES AND MITOCHONDRIAL DYSFUNCTIONS

Title (en)

NOVEL ANIMAL MODEL OF ALZHEIMER DISEASE WITH AMYLOID PLAQUES AND MITOCHONDRIAL DYSFUNCTIONS

Title (de)

NEUES TIERMODELL FÜR DIE KRANKHEIT VON ALZHEIMER, WELCHES AMYLOIDE ABLAGERUNGEN SOWIE MITOCHONDRIALE STÖRUNGEN AUFWEIST

Title (fr)

NOUVEAU MODELE ANIMAL DE LA MALADIE D'ALZHEIMER PRESENTANT A LA FOIS DES PLAQUES AMYLOIDES ET DES DYSFONCTIONNEMENTS MITOCHONDRIAUX

Publication

EP 1235482 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00962636 A

Priority

  • FR 0002540 W
  • FR 9911678 A
  • US 16118399 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0120977A1] The invention concerns the field of transgenic animal models and more particularly, animal models of Alzheimer disease. The invention relates to a novel animal model of Alzheimer disease having both amyloid plaques and mitochondrial dysfunctions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01K 67/027; A61K 49/00; C07K 14/47; C12N 5/10; G01N 33/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01K 67/027 (2006.01); A61K 49/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); G01N 33/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A01K 67/027 (2013.01); A61K 49/00 (2013.01); C07K 14/47 (2013.01); C12N 5/10 (2013.01); G01N 33/50 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0120977A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0120977 A1 20010329; AU 7429400 A 20010424; CA 2384865 A1 20010329; EP 1235482 A1 20020904; JP 2003509071 A 20030311

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080409

2005-08-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050705

2002-11-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MOUSSAOUI-MRABET, SALIHA

2002-11-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BLANCHARD-BREGEON, VERONIQUE

2002-11-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: IMPERATO, ASSUNTA

2002-11-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BONICI, BRUNO

2002-11-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TREMP, GUNTER

2002-11-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CZECH, CHRISTIAN

2002-10-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MOUSSAOUI-MRABET, SALIHA

2002-10-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BLANCHARD-BREGEON, VERONIQUE

2002-10-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: IMPERATO, ASSUNTA

2002-10-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BONICI, BRUNO

2002-10-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TREMP, GUNTER

2002-10-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CZECH, CHRISTIAN

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020311

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI